EP1794995 - WIRELESS DEVICE TO MANAGE CROSS-NETWORK TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Integrated Cabinet Solutions Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Traverse, Inc. 42840 Christy Street, Suite 201 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Mark, D. 1192 St. Anthony Ct. Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
MANZO, Michael, Scott 3030 Pierce Street San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | 03 /
MAHMOOD, Tamara, Hills 10080 Firwood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
KOLBLY, Michael, J. 1312 Moonlight Way Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 05 /
STELTER, Ronald, D. 2526 Wildhorse Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 06 /
BRACKBILL, Douglas, L. 735 Meadow Road Aptos, CA 95003 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Williamson, Brian Williamson IP Law 4 The Courtyard Barnsbury Terrace Islington London N1 1JZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/21] | Williamson, Brian 4Williamson IP Law 4 The Courtyard Barnsbury Terrace London N1 1JZ / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05819443.2 | 29.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US35298 | Priority number, date | US20040614844P | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 614844 P | US20050238525 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: US 238525 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039552 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794995 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H04M3/42153 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04M3/42 (KR);
H04M3/42263 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M2201/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG NETZWERKÜBERGREIFENDER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTE | [2007/24] | English: | WIRELESS DEVICE TO MANAGE CROSS-NETWORK TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICES | [2007/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF SANS FIL PERMETTANT DE GÉRER DES SERVICES DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION INTER-RÉSEAUX | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 25.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/20] | 11.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/20] | Appeal following examination | 06.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T1352/18 | 10.05.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2407801 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-12,14-20,22-36 * the whole document *[I] 13,21 | International search | [X]US5329578 (BRENNAN PAUL M [CA], et al) | by applicant | US2005195802 | US2005195954 | US2005201362 |