EP1828876 - INTERPRETING AN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. Hewlett-Packard Company Intellectual Property Administration 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. Hewlett-Packard Company, Intellectual Property Administration 20555, S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUDDLESTON, Wyatt, A. 912 Colorado Drive Allen, Texas 75013 / US | 02 /
BLYTHE, Michael, M. 2834 Nw Pineview Drive Albany, Oregon 97321 / US | 03 /
SANDOVAL, Jonathan, J. 1000 Ne Circle Boulevard Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05819511.6 | 28.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US39678 | Priority number, date | US20040018187 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 18187 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006068703 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828876 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G06F3/0425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/40] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERPRETIEREN EINES BILDES | [2007/36] | English: | INTERPRETING AN IMAGE | [2007/36] | French: | INTERPRETATION D'UNE IMAGE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4561017 (GREENE RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5025314 (TANG JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5483261 (YASUTAKE TAIZO [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 29 - line 39 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 5; figures 13a-13e,17a,17b,19; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9730416 (THOMSON TRAINING & SIMULATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 1; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5726685 (KUTH RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 37 - line 49; figure 3 *; | [X]FR2756077 (OPTO SYSTEM [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 10; figures 1,5; claims 1,6,7,9,10 *; | [A]US6061177 (FUJIMOTO KENNETH NOBORU [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 49 - line 67; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A] - MEHTA N ET AL, "FEATURE EXTRACTION AS A TOOL FOR COMPUTER INPUT", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP. PARIS, MAY 3 - 5, 1982, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19820503), VOL. 2 CONF. 7, pages 818 - 820, XP002029733 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |