EP1835022 - CELL CULTURE METHOD AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Susumu Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | 02 /
Kishishita, Shohei Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | 03 /
Takuma, Shinya Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | 04 /
Hirashima, Chikashi Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | [2015/07] |
Former [2014/19] | 01 /
Goto, Susumu Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | ||
02 /
Kishishita, S. Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | |||
03 /
Takuma, Shinya Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | |||
04 /
Hirashima, C. Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | |||
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Goto, Susumu, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | ||
02 /
Kishishita, S., Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | |||
03 /
Takuma, Shinya, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | |||
04 /
Hirashima, C., Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 1158543 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819639.5 | 26.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005JP23709 | Priority number, date | JP20050000747 | 05.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005000747 | [2007/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073070 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835022 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835022 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C12N5/0037 (EP,US);
C12N5/0031 (KR);
C12N2500/80 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | C12N5/00, C12N5/10, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | ZELLKULTURVERFAHREN UND DESSEN NUTZUNG | [2007/38] | English: | CELL CULTURE METHOD AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME | [2007/38] | French: | METHODE DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE ET EMPLOI DE LADITE METHODE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2007 | Translation filed | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14189055.8 / EP2843040 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | BG | 11.02.2015 | |
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | EE | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1085083 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * example 4 *; | [DPX]WO2005005636 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [DPX] 1-16 * abstract *; | [E]EP1652925 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-16* paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0204] *; | [X] - PAGE WILLIAM J ET AL, "Growth of Azotobacter vinelandii UWD in fish peptone medium and simplified extraction of poly-beta-hydroxybutyrate", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 59, no. 12, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 4236 - 4244, XP002543473 [X] 1-4 * page 4237, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 4238, column R, paragraph 2 - page 4239, column R, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * | International search | [A]WO9523212 (SEA RUN HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [Y]WO9963058 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003334068 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, et al); | [Y] - FRAHM B. ET AL, "Improvement of a mammalian cell culture process by adaptive, model-based dialysis fed-batch cultivation and suppression of apoptosis", BIOPROCESS BIOSYST. ENG., (2003), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 1 - 10, XP002997132 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00449-003-0335-z | Examination | - A.-P. ZENG ET AL, "Mathematical modeling and analysis of glucose and glutamine utilization and regulation in cultures of continuous mammalian cells", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19950805), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1002/bit.260470308, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 334 - 346, XP055005401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260470308 | - XUEJUN GU ET AL, "Influence of Primatone RL supplementation on sialylation of recombinant human interferon-[gamma] produced by Chinese hamster ovary cell culture using serum-free media", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19971120), vol. 56, no. 4, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19971120)56:4<353::AID-BIT1>3.0.CO;2-N, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 353 - 360, XP055005426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19971120)56:4<353::AID-BIT1>3.0.CO;2-N | by applicant | WO9219759 | JPH0899902 | WO9963058 | JP2003334068 | JP2005000747 | WO2005005636 | WO2005056604 | - Introduction to Antibody Engineering, CHIJIN SHO KAN PUBLISHING COMPANY, pages 102 - 104 | - Affinity Chromatography Principles & Methods, AMERSHAM PHARMACIA BIOTECH, pages 56 - 60 |