EP1824429 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ANCHORING A SURGICAL ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Laboratories, Inc. 375 River Park Circle Marquette, MI 49855 / US | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUDEAU, Jeffrey 216 Cedar Lane Marquette, MI 49855 / US | 02 /
JANOWSKI, Brian 11 Specker Circle Marquette, MI 49855 / US | 03 /
NORMAN, Maria 404 Muskoday Negaunee, MI 49866 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05819922.5 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005US38697 | Priority number, date | US20040973659 | 26.10.2004 Original published format: US 973659 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047659 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1824429 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/7086 (EP,US);
A61B17/7091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERANKERUNG EINER CHIRURGISCHEN STANGE | [2007/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ANCHORING A SURGICAL ROD | [2007/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'ANCRAGE D'UNE TIGE CHIRURGICALE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5364397 (HAYES S KYLE [US], et al); | [A]US6648888 (SHLUZAS ALAN E [US]); | [X]US2003225408 (NICHOLS DAVID [US], et al) |