EP1833285 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT MOUNTING METHOD AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT MOUNTING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADA, Yoshiyuki c/o Mat.Elec.Ind.Co., Ltd. IPROC 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Tadahiko c/o Mat.Elec.Ind.Co., Ltd. IPROC 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2007/37] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05820159.1 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005JP23465 | Priority number, date | JP20040376071 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004376071 | [2007/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006070658 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833285 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H05K1/18 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
H05K1/18 (KR);
H05K3/305 (EP,US);
H05K3/3485 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10636 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANBRINGVERFAHREN UND ANBRINGSTRUKTUR FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTEN | [2007/37] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMPONENT MOUNTING METHOD AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT MOUNTING STRUCTURE | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE ET STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE DE COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2006 | Translation filed | 11.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 19.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0745927 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09167890 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS58166070U |