EP1831411 - EXTRACTION PROCESS FOR METALS LIKE GOLD AND PLATINUM INCL. FINE GRINDING , PULPING AND OXYGENATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maelgwyn Mineral Services Africa (Proprietary) Limited 1332 Club House Street 1709 Maraisburg / ZA | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Adrian 2 Cascades, Russell Street 1501 Benoni / ZA | 02 /
TINNISWOOD, Brian 1852 Hadida Street, Randpark Ridge 2156 Randburg / ZA | 03 /
BATTERSBY, Michael 38 Marion Street Splott, Cardiff CF24 2DJ / GB | 04 /
IMHOF, Rainer Leharweg 23 46282 Dorsten / DE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05820532.9 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005IB03786 | Priority number, date | ZA20040010146 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: ZA 200410146 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064350 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831411 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831411 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1831411 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/00, C22B3/00, C22B3/04, C22B11/00, C22B11/08 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C22B11/04 (EP,US);
C22B11/08 (EP,US);
C22B3/00 (EP,US);
C22B3/04 (EP,US);
C22B3/12 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | 12.07.2007 | BA | 12.07.2007 | HR | 12.07.2007 | MK | 12.07.2007 | YU | 12.07.2007 | Title | German: | EXTRAKTIONSVERFAHREN FÜR METALLE WIE GOLD UND PLATIN DURCH OXYGENIEREN VON FEIN ZERMAHLENEN ERZSCHLÄMMEN | [2007/37] | English: | EXTRACTION PROCESS FOR METALS LIKE GOLD AND PLATINUM INCL. FINE GRINDING , PULPING AND OXYGENATING | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION POUR DES METAUX TELS QUE L'OR ET LE PLATINE, COMPRENANT LE BROYAGE FIN, LE PULPAGE ET L'OXYGENISATION | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | IT | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | LV | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | IE | 15.12.2008 | LU | 15.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4738718 (BAKSHANI NANDKUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * examples 1-4; tables II-V *; | [XY]AU2718292 (WESTERN MINERALS TECH PTY LTD) [X] 1-16 * page 3 - page 6; examples 1-4; claims 1-7 * [Y] 22; | [Y]EP0574175 (SINCLAIR IAN MACDONALD [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 2, line 9 - line 13; figure 3; example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]WO0017407 (MIM HOLDINGS LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-22* page 10 - page 11; figures 1,2; example 7; claims 1-23 *; | [YA]US6251163 (KING JAMES A [CA]) [Y] 22 * column 3, line 17 - line 22; figures 1A,1B; claims 1,8 * [A] |