EP1833988 - NOVEL GENES AND MARKERS ASSOCIATED TO TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2013/33] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Oy Jurilab Ltd Microkatu 1 FI-70210 Kuopio / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALONEN, Jukka T. Honkasaarentie 14 FI-70100 Kuopio / FI | 02 /
AALTO, Juha-matti Jännepolku 5 FI-71800 Siilinjärvi / FI | 03 /
FUENTES, Ricardo Kasarmikatu 11 B 36 FI-70110 Kuopio / FI | 04 /
KONTKANEN, Outi Hiidenkatu 17 FI-70840 Kuopio / FI | 05 /
PIRSKANEN, Mia Minna Canthinkatu 2 A 18 FI-70100 Kuopio / FI | 06 /
UIMARI, Pekka Kalevalankatu 18 A 3 FI-70500 Kuopio / FI | [2013/12] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
AALTO, Juha-Matti Honkasaarentie 14 FI-70100 Kuopio / FI | ||
02 /
FUENTES, Ricardo Kasarmikatu 11B 36 FI-70110 Kuopio / FI | |||
03 /
KONTKANEN, Outi Hiidenkatu 17 FI-70840 Kupio / FI | |||
04 /
PIRSKANEN, Mia Minna Canthinkatu 2 A 18 FI-70100 Kuopio / FI | |||
05 /
UIMARI, Pekka Vuorikatu 34 A 22 FI-70100 Kuopio / FI | |||
06 /
SALONEN, Jukka T. Kalevalankatu 18 A 3 FI-70500 Kuopio / FI | Representative(s) | Schwander, Kuno, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2012/29] |
Former [2011/01] | Schwander, Kuno, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd., Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2009/35] | Biermann, Jan, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | ||
Former [2007/38] | Karvinen, Leena Maria, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05820627.7 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005FI50486 | Priority number, date | FI20050000011 | 05.01.2005 Original published format: FI 20050011 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072654 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833988 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833988 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,FI,US);
C12Q1/6813 (FI);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,FI,US);
G01N33/50 (FI);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US);
G01N2800/042 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | NEUE, MIT DIABETES MELLITUS TYP 2 ASSOZIIERTE GENE UND MARKER | [2007/38] | English: | NOVEL GENES AND MARKERS ASSOCIATED TO TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS | [2007/38] | French: | NOUVEAUX GENES ET MARQUEURS ASSOCIES AU DIABETE SUCRE DE TYPE 2 | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 29.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2005 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | IE | 23.12.2013 | LU | 23.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0157190 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 37,41-57,76-81 * page 1, line 28 - line 32 * * claims 1-5,10-16,27,28 * * sequences 790,1774 * [I] 38-40,58-60; | [I]WO2004053158 (JURILAB LTD OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-81 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2004067771 (HVIDOVRE HOSPITAL [DK], et al) [I] 1-81 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2004074514 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-81 * the whole document *; | [I] - DAS SWAPAN KUMAR; CHU WINSTON; ZHANG ZHENGXIAN; HASSTEDT SANDRA J; ELBEIN STEVEN C, "Calsquestrin 1 (CASQ1) gene polymorphisms under chromosome 1q21 linkage peak are associated with type 2 diabetes in Northern European Caucasians.", DIABETES DEC 2004, (200412), vol. 53, no. 12, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 3300 - 3306, XP002369382 [I] 1-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.53.12.3300 | [XI] - SHIBATA H; HUYNH D P; PULST S M, "A novel protein with RNA-binding motifs interacts with ataxin-2.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS 22 MAY 2000, (20000522), vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 1303 - 1313, XP009123262 [X] 37,41-57,76-81 * the whole document * [I] 38-40,58-60 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/9.9.1303 | [XI] - SNPDB, NCBI, (20031113), Database accession no. rs10521039, XP007909883 [X] 37-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - SNPDB, NCBI, (20031113), Database accession no. rs10500351, XP007909880 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - snpdb, NCBI, (20010929), Database accession no. rs2346606, XP007909887 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - snpdb, ncbi, (20031113), Database accession no. rs10500352, XP007909881 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - snpdb, ncbi, (20010201), Database accession no. rs1922585, XP007909885 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - snpdb, ncbi, (20000630), Database accession no. rs225246, XP007909886 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [XI] - snpdb, ncbi, (20031113), Database accession no. rs10521040, XP007909884 [X] 37-39,41-57 * the whole document * [I] 40,58-60 | [A] - VAN TILBURG J; VAN HAEFTEN T W; PEARSON P; WIJMENGA C, "Defining the genetic contribution of type 2 diabetes mellitus.", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS SEP 2001, (200109), vol. 38, no. 9, ISSN 1468-6244, pages 569 - 578, XP007909868 [A] 1-81 | International search | [X]WO0162798 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al); | [X]US2002198371 (WANG DAVID G [US]); | [X]US2004146890 (MATSUZAKI HAJIME [US], et al); | [X]US6812339 (VENTER J CRAIG [US], et al); | [X]WO2004034969 (REGULOME CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO03062376 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004084797 (HUBIT GENOMIX INC [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2005198640 (BIOMARKER SCIENCE KK, et al); | [XP]WO2006010514 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al); | [XP]WO2005003552 (TAMA TLO LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2005003766 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al) | [A] - NADLER S.T. ET AL., "The expression of adipogenic genes is decreased in obesity and diabetes mellitus", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20001010), vol. 97, no. 21, pages 11371 - 11376, XP002203186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.21.11371 | [A] - PATTI M.E. ET AL., "Coordinated reduction of genes of oxidative metabolism in humans with insulin resistance and diabetes: Potential role of PGC1 and NRF1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 8466 - 8471, XP008122553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.1032913100 | by applicant | - ALTSHULER D; HIRSCHHORN JN; KLANNEMARK M; LINDGREN CM; VOHL MC ET AL., "The common PPARgamma Pro 12AIa polymorphism is associated with decreased risk of type 2 diabetes", NAT. GENET., (2000), vol. 26, pages 76 - 80 | - "Report of the Expert Committee on the Diagnosis and Classification of Diabetes Mellitus", Diabetes Care, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, (2003), vol. 26, pages S5 - S20 | - BARNETT AH; EFFC; LESLIE RD; PYKE DA, "Diabetes in identical twins. A study of 200 pairs", DIABETOLOGIA, (1981), vol. 20, pages 87 - 93 | - BELL GI; XIANG K; NEWMAN MV; WU S; WRIGHT LG; FAJANS SS; SPIELMAN RS; COX NJ, "Gene for non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus (maturity-onset diabetes of the young subtype) is linked to DNA polymorphism on human chromosome 20q", PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1991), vol. 88, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.88.4.1484, pages 1484 - 1488, XP002051546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.4.1484 | - BERG AH; COMBS TP; SCHERER PE., "ACRP30/adiponectin: an adipokine regulating glucose and lipid metabolism", TRENDS ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2002), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/S1043-2760(01)00524-0, pages 84 - 9, XP002286670 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1043-2760(01)00524-0 | - BODEN G., "Free fatty acids-the link between obesity and insulin resistance", ENDOCR PRACT., (2001), vol. 7, pages 44 - 51 | - BUCHANAN TA., "Pancreatic beta-cell loss and preservation in type 2 diabetes", CLIN THER., (2003), vol. 25, no. B, pages B32 - 46, XP008125103 | - BYRNE MM; STURIS J; MENZEL S; YAMAGATA K; FAJANS SS; DRONSFIELD MJ; BAIN SC; HATTERSLEY AT; VELHO G; FROGUEL P, "Altered insulin secretory response to glucose in diabetic and nondiabetic subjects with mutations in the diabetes susceptibility gene MODY3 on chromosome 12", DIABETES, (1996), vol. 45, pages 1503 - 1510 | - CHIU KC; PROVINCE MA; DOWSE GK; ZIMMET PZ; WAGNER G ET AL., "A genetic marker at the glucokinase gene locus for type 2 (non-insulin-dependent) diabetes mellitus in Mauritian Creoles", DIABETOLOGIA, (1992), vol. 35, pages 632 - 38 | - CLEMENT K; PUEYO ME; VAXILLAIRE M; RAKOTOAMBININA B; THUILLIER F; PASSA P; FROGUEL P; ROBERTS J; VELHO G., "Assessment of insulin sensitivity in glucokinase-deficient subjects", DIABETOLOGIA, (1996), vol. 39, pages 82 - 90 | - COLE SP; CAMPLING BG; ATLAW T; KOZBOR D; RODER JC, "Human monoclonal antibodies", MOL CELL BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 62, pages 109 - 20 | - DAMCOTT CM; MOFFETT SP; FEINGOLD E; BARMADA MM; MARSHALL JA; HAMMAN RF; FERRELL RE., "Genetic variation in fatty acid-binding protein-4 and peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma interactively influence insulin sensitivity and body composition in males", METABOLISM, (2004), vol. 53, pages 303 - 9 | - DANDONA P; ALJADA A; BANDYOPADHYAY A, "Inflammation: the link between insulin resistance, obesity and diabetes", TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.it.2003.10.013, pages 4 - 7, XP004481199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2003.10.013 | - DEEB SS; FAJAS L; NEMOTO M; PIHLAJAMAKI J; MYKKANEN L ET AL., "A Prol2Ala substitution in PPARgamma2 associated with decreased receptor activity, lower body mass index and improved insulin sensitivity", NAT. GENET., (1998), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/3099, pages 284 - 87, XP002974816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/3099 | - DEMENAIS F; KANNINEN T; LINDGREN CM; WILTSHIRE S; GAGET S; DANDRIEUX C; ALMGREN P; SJOGREN M; HATTERSLEY A; DINA C, "A meta-analysis of four European genome screens (GIFT Consortium) shows evidence for a novel region on chromosome 17p 11.2 -q22 linked to type 2 diabetes", HUM MOL GENET., (2003), vol. 12, pages 1865 - 73 | - DICKSON LM; RHODES CJ, "Pancreatic beta-cell growth and survival in the onset of type 2 diabetes: a role for protein kinase B in the Akt", AM J PHYSIOL ENDOCRINOL METAB., (2004), vol. 287, pages EI92 - 8 | - ERIKSSON JG; LINDI V; UUSITUPA M; FORSEN TJ; LAAKSO M; OSMOND C; BARKER DJ, "The effects of the Prol2Ala polymorphism of the peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor-gamma2 gene on insulin sensitivity and insulin metabolism interact with size at birth", DIABETES, (2002), vol. 51, pages 2321 - 4 | - ERONEN L; GEERTS F; TOIVONEN H., "2004. A Markov chain approach to reconstruction of long haplotypes", PAC SYMP BIOCOMPUT., pages 104 - 15 | - FLOREZ JC; HIRSCHHORN J; ALTSHULER D., "The inherited basis of diabetes mellitus: implications for the genetic analysis of complex traits", ANNU REV GENOMICS HUM GENET, (2003), vol. 4, pages 257 - 91 | - FROGUEL P; VAXILLAIRE M; SUN F; VELHO G; ZOUALI H; BUTEL MO; LESAGE S; VIONNET N; CLEMENT K; FOUGEROUSSE F ET AL., "Close linkage of glucokinase locus on chromosome 7p to early-onset non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus", NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 162 - 164 | - GLOYN AL; HASHIM Y; ASHCROFT SJ; ASH-FIELD R; WILTSHIRE S; TURNER RC, "Association studies of variants in promoter and coding regions of beta-cell ATP-sensitive K-channel genes SUR1 and Kir6.2 with Type 2 diabetes mellitus (UKPDS 53", DIABETES MED., (2001), vol. 18, pages 206 - 12 | - GLOYN AL; WEEDON MN; OWEN KR; TURNER MJ; KNIGHT BA ET AL., "Large-scale association studies of variants in genes encoding the pancreatic {beta}-cell KATP channel subunits Kir6.2 (KCNJ11) and SUR1 (ABCC8) confirm that the KCNJl E23K variant is associated with type 2 diabetes", DIABETES, (2003), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.2337/diabetes.52.2.568, pages 568 - 72, XP002369699 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.52.2.568 | - GOUGH SC; SAKER PJ; PRITCHARD LE; MERRIMAN TR; MERRIMAN ME ET AL., "Mutation of the glucagon receptor gene and diabetes mellitus in the UK: association or founder effect?", HUM. MOL. GENET., (1995), vol. 4, pages 1609 - 12 | - GRIFFITHS AD; MALMQVIST M; MARKS JD; BYE JM; EMBLETON MJ; MCCAFFERTY J; BAIER M; HOLLIGER KP; GORICK BD; HUGHES-JONES NC ET AL., "Human anti-self antibodies with high specificity from phage display libraries", EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 34, XP002733039 | - CELL, (2005), vol. 122, pages 337 - 49 | - GUTHRIE RA; GUTHRIE DW, "Pathophysiology of diabetes mellitus", CRIT CARE NURS Q, (2004), vol. 27, pages 113 - 25 | - HAGER J; HANSEN L; VAISSE C; VIONNET N; PHILIPPI A ET AL., "A missense mutation in the glucagon receptor gene is associated with non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus", NAT. GENET., (1995), vol. 9, pages 299 - 304 | - HANI EH; BOUTIN P; DURAND E; INOUE H; PERMUTT MA ET AL., "Missense mutations in the pancreatic islet beta cell inwardly rectifying K+ channel gene (KIR6.2/BIR): a meta-analysis suggests a role in the polygenic basis of Type II diabetes mellitus in Caucasians", DIABETOLOGIA, (1998), vol. 41, pages 1511 - 15 | - HANI EH; CLEMENT K; VELHO G; VIONNET N; HAGER J ET AL., "Genetic studies of the sulfonylurea receptor gene locus in NIDDM and in morbid obesity among French Caucasians", DIABETES, (1997), vol. 46, pages 688 - 94 | - HANSEN T; ECHWALD SM; HANSEN L; MOLLER AM; ALMIND K ET AL., "Decreased tolbutamide-stimulated insulin secretion in healthy subjects with sequence variants in the high-affinity sulfonylurea receptor gene", DIABETES, (1998), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.2337/diabetes.47.4.598, pages 598 - 605, XP002109828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.47.4.598 | - HARA K; OKADA T; TOBE K; YASUDA K; MORI Y ET AL., "The Prol2Ala polymorphism in PPAR gamma2 may confer resistance to type 2 diabetes", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2000), vol. 271, doi:doi:10.1006/bbrc.2000.2605, pages 212 - 16, XP003010550 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.2605 | - HAY BN; SORGE JA; SHOPES B., "Bacteriophage cloning and Escherichia coli expression of a human IgM Fab", HUM ANTIBODIES HYBRIDOMAS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 81 - 5 | - HAYASHI N; KIPRIYANOV S; FUCHS P; WELSCHOFM; DORSAM H; LITTLE M., "A single expression system for the display, purification and conjugation of single-chain antibodies", GENE, (1995), vol. 160, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(95)00218-U, pages 129 - 30, XP004042191 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00218-U | - HERING S; KARAWAJEW L; PASTERNAK G., "Raji-K562 hybrids and their use for trioma production", BIOMED BIOCHIM ACTA., (1988), vol. 47, pages 211 - 6, XP008148347 | - HERMAN WH; FAJANS SS; ORITZ FJ; SMITH MJ; STURIS J; BELL GI; POLONSKY KS; HALTER JB, "Abnormal insulin secretion, not insulin resistance, is the genetic or primary defect ofMODY in the RW pedigree", DIABETES, (1994), vol. 43, pages 40 - 46 | - HUSE WD; SASTRY L; IVERSON SA; KANG AS; ALTING-MEES M; BURTON DR; BENKOVIC SJ; LEMER RA., "Generation of a large combinatorial library of the immunoglobulin repertoire in phage lambda", SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2531466, pages 1275 - 81, XP000083689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2531466 | - INOUE H; FERRER J; WELLING CM; ELBEIN SC; HOFFINAN M ET AL., "Sequence variants in the sulfonylurea receptor (SUR) gene are associated with NIDDM in Caucasians", DIABETES, (1996), vol. 45, pages 825 - 31 | - KADOWAKI T; KADOWAKI H; MORI Y; TOBE K; SAKUTA R; SUZUKI Y; TANABE Y; SAKURA H; AWATA T; GOTO Y ET AL., "A subtype of diabetes mellitus associated with a mutation of mitochondrial DNA", N ENGL J MED, (1994), vol. 330, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJM199404073301403, pages 962 - 968, XP055169254 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199404073301403 | - KAHN CR; FLIER JS; BAR RS; ARCHER JA; GORDEN P; MARTIN MM; ROTH J., "The syndromes of insulin resistance and acanthosis nigricans", N ENGL J MED, (1976), vol. 294, pages 739 - 745 | - KOHLER G; MILSTEIN C., "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity", NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497, XP002024548 | - KOZBOR D; LAGARDE AE; RODER JC., "Human hybridomas constructed with antigen- specific Epstein-Barr virus-transformed cell lines", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1982), vol. 79, pages 6651 - 5, XP001345428 | - KWOK P-Y, "Methods for genotyping single nucleotide polymorphisms", ANN REV GENOMICS HUM GENET., (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.genom.2.1.235, pages 235 - 258, XP001153175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.genom.2.1.235 | - LAAKSONEN DE; LAKKA TA; LAKKA H-M; NYYSSONEN K; RISSANEN T; NISKANEN LK; SALONEN JT., "Serum fatty acid composition predicts development of impaired fasting glycaemia and diabetes in middle-aged men", DIABETIC MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 19, pages 456 - 64 | - LAKKA H-M; OKSANEN L; TUOMAINEN T-P; KONTULA K; SALONEN JT., "The common pentanucleotide polymorphism of the 3'-untranslated region of the leptin receptor gene is associated with serum insulin levels and the risk of type 2 diabetes in non-diabetic men: a prospective case-control study", J INT MED, (2000), vol. 248, pages 77 - 83 | - LEHTOVIRTA M; KAPRIO J; GRROP L; TROMBETTA M; BONADONNA RC, "Heritability of model-derived parameters of beta cell secretion during intravenous and oral glucose tolerance tests: a study of twins", DIABETOLOGIA, (2005), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1007/s00125-005-1815-2, pages 1604 - 13, XP019322625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-005-1815-2 | - LI SR; BARONI MG; OELBAUM RS; STOCK J; GALTON DJ., "Association of genetic variant of the glucose transporter with non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus", LANCET, (1988), vol. 2, pages 368 - 70 | - LUAN J; BROWNE PO; HARDING AH; HALSALL DJ; O'RAHILLY S; CHATTERJEE VK; WAREHAM NJ, "Evidence for gene-nutrient interaction at the PPARgamma locus", DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.2337/diabetes.50.3.686, pages 686 - 9, XP055060375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.50.3.686 | - MARTIN BC; WARRAM JH; KROLEWSKI AS; BERGMAN RN; SOELDNER JS; KAHN CR, "Role of glucose and insulin resistance in development of type 2 diabetes mellitus: results of a 25-year follow-up study", LANCET, (1992), vol. 340, pages 925 - 9 | - MCCARTHY MI; HITMAN GA; HITCHINS M; RIIKONEN A; STENGARD J ET AL., "Glucokinase gene polymorphisms: a genetic marker for glucose intolerance in a cohort of elderly Finnish men", DIABETES MED., (1994), vol. 11, pages 198 - 204 | - MEMISOGLU A; HU FB; HANKINSON SE; MANSON JE; DE VIVO I; WILLETT WC; HUNTER DJ, "Interaction between a peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma gene polymorphism and dietary fat intake in relation to body mass", HUM MOL GENET., (2003), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/ddg318, pages 2923 - 9, XP002554348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddg318 | - MORI H; IKEGAMI H; KAWAGUCHI Y; SEINO S; YOKOI N ET AL., "The Prol2 --* Ala substitution in PPAR-gamma is associated with resistance to development of diabetes in the general population: possible involvement in impairment of insulin secretion in individuals with type 2 diabetes", DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 891 - 94 | - MOTOSHIMA H; WU X; SINHA MK; HARDY VE; ROSATO EL; BARBOT DJ; ROSATO FE; GOLDSTEIN BJ, "Differential regulation ofadiponectin secretion from cultured human omental and subcutaneous adipocytes: effects of insulin and rosiglitazone", J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB., (2002), vol. 87, pages 5662 - 7 | - NIELSEN PE; EGHOLM M; BERG RH; BUCHARDT O., "Sequence-selective recognition of DNA by strand displacement with a thymine-substituted polyamide", SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1962210, pages 1497 - 500, XP002912953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1962210 | - PELTONEN L; JALANKO A; VARILO T, "Molecular genetics of the Finnish disease heritage", HUM MOL GENET., (1999), vol. 8, pages 1913 - 23 | - PONTIROLI AE; CAPRA F; VEGLIA F; FERRARI M; XIANG KS ET AL., "Genetic contribution of polymorphism of the GLUT and GLUT4 genes to the susceptibility to type 2 (non-insulin-dependent) diabetes mellitus in different populations", ACTA DIABETOLOGICA, (1996), vol. 33, pages 193 - 97 | - POULSEN P; KYVIK KO; VAAG A; BECK-NIELSEN H., "Heritability of type II (non-insulin-dependent) diabetes mellitus and abnormal glucose tolerance-a population-based twin study", DIABETOLOGIA, (1999), vol. 42, pages 139 - 45 | - PRENTKI M; JOLY E; EL-ASSAAD W; RODUIT R., "Malonyl-CoA signaling, lipid partitioning, and glucolipotoxicity: role in beta-cell adaptation and failure in the etiology of diabetes", DIABETES, (2002), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 5405 - 13 | - RAVUSSIN E; SMITH SR., "Increased fat intake, impaired fat oxidation, and failure of fat cell proliferation result in ectopic fat storage, insulin resistance, and type 2 diabetes mellitus", ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (2002), vol. 967, pages 363 - 78 | - REARDON W; ROSS RJM; SWEENEY MG; LUXON LM; PEMBREY ME; HARDING AE, "Trembath RC. 1992. Diabetes mellitus associated with a pathogenic point mutation in mitochondrial DNA", LANCET, vol. 340, pages 1376 - 1379 | - SAJANTILA A; SALEM AH; SAVOLAINEN P; BAUER K; GIERIG C; PAABO S., "Paternal and maternal DNA lineages reveal a bottleneck in the founding of the Finnish population", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1996), vol. 93, pages 12035 - 9 | - SALONEN JT; LAKKA TA; LAKKA H-M; VALKONEN V-P; EVERSON SA; KAPLAN GA., "Hyperinsulinemia is associated with the Incidence of hypertension and dyslipidemia in middle-aged men", DIABETES, (1998), vol. 47, pages 270 - 275 | - SALONEN JT; MALIN R; TUOMAINEN TP; NYYSSONEN K; LAKKA TA; LEHTIMAKI T., "Polymorphism in high density lipoprotein paraoxonase gene and risk of acute myocardial infarction in men: prospective nested case-control study", BMJ, (1999), vol. 319, pages 487 - 9 | - SALONEN JT; TUOMAINEN T-P; KONTULA K., "Role ofC282Y mutation in haemochromatosis gene in development of type 2 diabetes in healthy men: prospective cohort study", BRIT MED J, (2000), vol. 320, pages 1706 - 1707 | - SALONEN JT., "Is there a continuing need for longitudinal epidemiologic research? The Kuopio Ischaemic Heart Disease Risk Factor Study", ANN CLIN RES, (1988), vol. 20, pages 46 - 50 | - SALONEN, JT, "The value of founder populations in genetic analysis", CURRENT DRUG DISCOVERY, (2003), vol. 27, pages 30 - 31 | - SALTIEL AR; KAHN CR, "Insulin signalling and the regulation of glucose and lipid metabolism", NATURE, (2001), vol. 414, pages 799 - 806 | - SCHEEN AJ, "Pathophysiology of type 2 diabetes", ACTA CLIN BELG., (2003), vol. 58, pages 335 - 41 | - SCHEEN AJ., "Pathophysiology of insulin secretion", ANN ENDOCRINOL (PARIS, (2004), vol. 65, pages 29 - 36 | - SHULMAN GI., "Cellular mechanisms of insulin resistance.", J CLIN INVEST., (2000), vol. 106, pages 171 - 6 | - SYVANEN A-C, "Accessing genetic variation: Genotyping single nucleotide polymorphisms", NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS., (2001), vol. 2, pages 930 - 942, XP002462591 | - TAKEKAWA K; IKEGAMI H; FUKUDA M; UEDA H; KAWAGUCHI Y ET AL., "Early-onset type 2 (non-insulin-dependent) diabetes mellitus is associated with glucokinase locus, but not with adenosine deaminase locus, in the Japanese population", DIABETES RES. CLIN. PRACT., (1994), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-8227(94)90097-3, pages 141 - 46, XP026201568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-8227(94)90097-3 | - TAO T; TANIZAWA Y; MATSUTANI A; MATSUBARA A; KANEKO T; KAKU K., "HepG2/erythrocyte glucose transporter (GLUT1) gene in NIDDM: a population association study and molecular scanning in Japanese subjects", DIABETOLOGIA, (1995), vol. 38, pages 942 - 47 | - TAYLOR SI; 1992, "Lilly Lecture: molecular mechanisms of insulin resistance: lessons from patients with mutations in the insulin-receptor gene", DIABETES, vol. 41, pages 1473 - 1490 | - TOIVONEN HT; ONKAMO P; VASKO K; OLLIKAINEN V; SEVON P; MANNILA H; HERR M; KERE J., "Data mining applied to linkage disequilibrium mapping", AM J HUM GENET., (2000), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1086/302954, pages 133 - 45, XP000995225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/302954 | - TOMAS E; TSAO TS; SAHA AK; MURREY HE; ZHANG CC C; ITANI SI; LODISH HF; RUDERMAN NB., "Enhanced muscle fat oxidation and glucose transport by ACRP30 globular domain: acetyl-CoA carboxylase inhibition and AMP-activated protein kinase activation.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2002), vol. 99, pages 16309 - 13 | - TUOMAINEN TP; KONTULA K; NYYSSONEN K; LAKKA TA; HELIO T; SALONEN JT., "Increased risk of acute myocardial infarction in carriers of the hemochromatosis gene Cys282Tyr mutation : a prospective cohort study in men in eastern Finland", CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 100, pages 1274 - 9, XP009082573 | - UIMARI P; KONTKANEN O; VISSCHER PM; PIRSKANEN M; FUENTES R; SALONEN JT., "Genome-wide linkage disequilibrium from 100,000 SNPs in the East Finland founder population", TWIN RES HUM GENET., (2005), vol. 8, pages 185 - 97 | - VAN DEN OUWENLAND JMW; LEMKES HHPJ; RUITENBEEK W; SANDKUIJL LA, DE VIJLDER MF; STRUYVENBERG PAA; VAN DE KAMP; MAASSEN JA, "Mutation in mitochondrial tRNA (Leu(URR) gene in a large pedigree with maternally transmitted type II diabetes mellitus and deafness", NATURE GENET, (1992), vol. 1, pages 368 - 371 | - VAXILLAIRE M; BOCCIO V; PHILIPPI A; VIGOUROUX C; TERWILLIGER J; PASSA P; BECKMAN JS; VELHO G; LATHROP GM; FROGUEL P, "A gene for maturity onset diabetes of the young (MODY) maps to chromosome 12q", NATURE GENET, (1995), vol. 9, pages 418 - 423 | - VIONNET N; STOFFEL M; TAKEDA J; YASUDA K; BELL GI; ZOUALI H; LESAGE S; VELHO G; IRIS F; PASSA P ET AL., "Nonsense mutation in the glucokinase gene causes early-onset non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus", NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 721 - 722 | - "World Health Organization and the International Diabetes Federation", DIABETES ACTION NOW BOOKLET, (2004), URL: www.who.int/diabetes/actionnow/booklet/en (Accessed 02.07.04 | - WU X; HOFFSTEDT J; DEEB W; SINGH R; SEDKOVA N; ZILBERING A; ZHU L; PARK PK; ARNER P; GOLDSTEIN BJ., "Depot-specific variation in protein-tyrosine phosphatase activities in human omental and subcutaneous adipose tissue: a potential contribution to differential insulin sensitivity", J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB., (2001), vol. 86, pages 5973 - 80 | - YAMAGATA K; FURUTA H; ODA N; KAISAKI PJ; MENZEL S; COX NJ; FAJANS SS; SIGNORINI S; STOFFEL M; BELL GI, "Mutations in the hepatocyte factor-4a gene in maturity-onset diabetes ofthe young (MODY 1", NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 458 - 460 | - YAMAGATA K; ODA N; KAISAKI PJ; MENZEL S; FURUTA H; VAXILLAIRE M; SOUTHARM L; COX RD; LATHROP GM; BORIRAJ VV, "Mutations in the hepatocyte nuclear factor-1ø gene in maturity-onset diabetes ofthe young (MODY 3", NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 455 - 458 | - YAMAUCHI T; KAMON J; MINOKOSHI Y; ITO Y; WAKI H; UCHIDA S; YAMASHITA S; NODA M; KITA S; UEKI K, "Adiponectin stimulates glucose utilization and fatty-acid oxidation by activating AMP-activated protein kinase", NAT MED., (2002), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nm788, pages 1288 - 95, XP002977679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm788 | - ZICK Y., "Insulin resistance: a phosphorylation-based uncoupling of insulin signaling", TRENDS CELL BIOL., (2001), vol. 11, pages 437 - 41, XP004611316 |