EP1958309 - ELECTRICAL ENERGY TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEROLD, Gerhard Meisenweg 20 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KIRSCHNER, Lutz Ringstr. 28 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Hermann Bodenfeld 23 91466 Gerhardshofen / DE | 04 /
RETZMANN, Dietmar Richard-Wagner-Str. 6a 91315 Höchstadt / DE | [2008/34] | Application number, filing date | 05820783.8 | 07.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005DE02222 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065383 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958309 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958309 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/18 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H02J3/1814 (EP,US);
Y02E40/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2009/01] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/34] | English: | ELECTRICAL ENERGY TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2008/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 08.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.03.2013 | GB | 07.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]DE19937661 (NKT CABLES GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-5,14-17 * the whole document * [Y] 11-13; | [Y]DE19737590 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US5032738 (VITHAYATHIL JOHN J [US]) [A] 7-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 14 - line 65; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 54 - line 65; figure 3 *; | [E]DE102004040247 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * | [A] - KASZTENNY B ET AL, "VSI-BASED SERIES COMPENSATION SCHEME FOR TRANSMISSION LINES", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRICAL POWER ENGINEERING, VDE VERLAG, DE, (199903), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 0939-3072, pages 101 - 108, XP001147299 [A] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE19937661 |