EP1846517 - AGENT TO REMOVE PAINT, LACQUER, GLUE, PLASTIC OR SIMILAR FROM OBJECTS AND THE USE OF IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envirochem IEC AB Älegàrdsgatan 1 431 50 Mölndal / SE | [2010/23] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Stripp Chemicals AB Aalegaardsgatan 1 431 50 Mölndal / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUELSSON, Anna Mariagatan 4A S-414 71 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
BILLTON, Ulf Bassängbacken 2 S-429 43 Särö / SE | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August, et al Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August, et al Cegumark AB, Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05820987.5 | 29.12.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005SE02059 | Priority number, date | SE20040003217 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: SE 0403217 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071194 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846517 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846517 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C09D9/005 (EP,US);
C09D9/00 (SE);
C11D1/04 (SE);
C11D3/26 (SE);
C11D3/30 (SE);
C11D7/50 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUM ENTFERNEN VON ANSTRICHSTOFF, LACK, LEIM, KUNSTSTOFF ODER DERGLEICHEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2007/43] | English: | AGENT TO REMOVE PAINT, LACQUER, GLUE, PLASTIC OR SIMILAR FROM OBJECTS AND THE USE OF IT | [2007/43] | French: | AGENT DE DÉCAPAGE DE PEINTURES, VERNIS, COLLES PLASTIQUES OU SUBSTANCES SIMILAIRES RECOUVRANT DES OBJETS, ET UTILISATION DUDIT AGENT | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 29.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2005 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | IE | 29.12.2016 | LU | 29.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.12.2005 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
IE | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.12.2005 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
IE | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
IE | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5202049 (BINGHAM MARY E [US]); | [A]US6358907 (VITOMIR SERGIO [CA]); | [A]US2002144718 (WILSON NEIL R [US]); | [A]US2003040449 (KARLSSON KJELL [SE], et al); | [A]WO03027196 (STRIPP CHEMICALS AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2004127375 (FOSTER KATHRYN E [US]); | [A]US2004248753 (KARLSSON KJELL [SE], et al); | [A]US2004259753 (WILSON NEIL R [US], et al) | by applicant | US5202049 | DE19943418 | US6358907 | US2003040449 | WO03027196 | US2004127375 | US2004206276 | US2004248753 |