EP1827797 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLASTIC FUEL TANK WITH IMPROVED CREEP STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de la Fusée, 98-100 1130 Bruxelles / BE | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeck, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRIEL, Bjorn Populierenhof, 62 B-9820 Merelbeke / BE | 02 /
LEONARD, Stéphane Rue Du Sillon, 146 Bte4 B-1070 Brussels / BE | 03 /
FERRACIN, Thierry Woluweveld, 72 B-1932 Sint-stevens-woluwe / BE | 04 /
JANNOT, Frédéric Rue du Fond des Bois, 9 B-1470 Bousval / BE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
CRIEL, Bjorn Populierenhof, 62 B-9820 Merelbeke / BE | ||
02 /
LEONARD, Stéphane Rue Du Sillon, 146 Bte4 B-1070 Brussels / BE | |||
03 /
FERRACIN, Thierry Woluweveld, 72 B-1932 Sint-stevens-woluwe / BE | |||
04 /
JANNOT, Frédéric Avenue Georges Henri, 36 B-1200 Brussels / BE | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [2024/29] |
Former [2015/28] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/27] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/36] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05821506.2 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP56750 | Priority number, date | FR20040013310 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413310 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064004 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827797 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827797 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1827797 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/20, B29C51/12, B60K15/03, B29L22/00, B29L31/30 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B29C49/20 (EP,KR,US);
B29C31/008 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/0691 (US);
B29C49/06914 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/4273 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/64 (KR,US);
B29C49/78 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/267 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/46 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/028 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/606 (KR,US);
B29C66/53245 (KR,US);
B29C66/61 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/7234 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/90 (KR,US);
B29D22/003 (KR,US);
B60K15/03177 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2008 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2013 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2034 (KR,US);
B29C2049/206 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2073 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2078 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2086 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2095 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/007 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/072 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/60 (EP,US);
B29C66/532 (EP,US);
B29K2023/065 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2023/086 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2061/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PLASTIKBRENNSTOFFTANKS MIT VERBESSERTER KRIECHFESTIGKEIT | [2007/36] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLASTIC FUEL TANK WITH IMPROVED CREEP STRENGTH | [2007/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT EN PLASTIQUE DOTE D'UNE RESISTANCE SUPERIEURE AU FLUAGE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15173215.3 / EP2944449 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2016
11.04.2016
ADMISSIBLE Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG Kautexstr. 52 53229 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2016
11.04.2016
ADMISSIBLE Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG Kautexstr. 52 53229 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Kierdorf Ritschel Richly Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 13.05.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.01.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 25.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1251/19 | 12.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 04.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1251/19 | 07.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2005 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | IE | 13.12.2015 | LU | 13.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS55105539 ; | [XA]JPS5525380 ; | [XA]JPS5511823 ; | [XA]JPS5628831 ; | [A]JP2002285928 ; | [A]JPH02171228 ; | [XA]EP0466275 (WIVA BV [NL]); | [X]US5243933 (MUKAWA TATSUHIKO [JP]); | [AD]EP1110697 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [X]US6338420 (PACHCIARZ MAHLON RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]EP1216811 (KIEFEL GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | JPS55105539 | US6338420 | Opposition | DE2256945 | DE1780682 | US4416461 | US4891000 | GB2236288 | DE69208616T | EP1110697 | US6338420 | EP1238845 | DE10231866 | DE10260953 | US6814921 | DE60112408T |