EP1830875 - IL-15 ANTIGEN ARRAYS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Zürich-Schlieren / CH | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Martin Cytos Biotechnology AG, Goldackerweg 8 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | 02 /
ZOU, Yu Alte Zürcherstrasse 35 CH-8903 Birmensdorf / CH | 03 /
TISSOT, Alain Cytos Biotechnology AG, Segantinistrasse 35 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 04 /
MAURER, Patrik Wieshofstrasse 103 CH-8408 Winterthur / CH | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
BACHMANN, Martin Cytos Biotechnology AG, Goldackerweg 8 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | ||
02 /
ZOU, Yu Alte Zürcherstrasse 35 CH-8903 Birmensdorf / CH | |||
03 /
TISSOT, Alain Cytos Biotechnology AG, Segantinistrasse 35 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
MAURER, Patrik Rychenbergstrasse 38 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 05821523.7 | 12.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP56680 | Priority number, date | US20040635179P | 13.12.2004 Original published format: US 635179 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006063974 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830875 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/385, A61P11/06, A61P19/02, A61P9/10 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (KR);
A61K38/20 (KR);
A61K39/0005 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IL-15-ANTIGEN-ANORDNUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2007/37] | English: | IL-15 ANTIGEN ARRAYS AND USES THEREOF | [2007/37] | French: | JEUX ORDONNES D'ANTIGENES IL-15 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9850071 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [A] 1-19* pages 3-4; examples 1,2 *; | [YD]WO03017935 (GENMAB INC [US], et al) [YD] 21,22 * pages 2-5; examples 3-11 *; | [Y]WO03040164 (CYTOS BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-19 * examples 1-11; claims 1-94 *; | [XY]US2003099668 (BACHMANN MARTIN [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-17,19 * paragraphs [0162] , [0270] , [0271] , [0334] , [0329] * [Y] 2-4,18; | [Y]WO2004007538 (CYTOS BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-19 * examples 1-13 *; | [YD]WO2004009124 (CYTOS BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XY] - RUCKERT R ET AL, "IL-15 antagonists inhibit allergic responses and airway hyperresponsiveness in a murine model of asthma bronchiale", IMMUNOBIOLOGY, & JOINT ANNUAL MEETING OF THE GERMAN AND DUTCH SOCIETIES FOR IMMUNOLOGY; MAASTRICHT, NETHERLANDS; OCTOBER 20 -23, 2004, (200410), vol. 209, no. 4-6, ISSN 0171-2985, page 382, XP009065905 [X] 20 * abstract * [Y] 21-24 | [Y] - KIRMAN I ET AL, "Interleukin-15 and its role in chronic inflammatory diseases.", INFLAMMATION RESEARCH : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN HISTAMINE RESEARCH SOCIETY ... [ET AL.]. JUL 1998, (199807), vol. 47, no. 7, ISSN 1023-3830, pages 285 - 289, XP009065881 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000110050331 | [Y] - WUTTGE D M ET AL, "Expression of interleukin-15 in mouse and human atherosclerotic lesions.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY. AUG 2001, (200108), vol. 159, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 417 - 423, XP009065882 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Interleukin-15 precursor (IL-15).", UniProt, (19950201), Database accession no. P40933, URL: EBI, XP002379667 [Y] 2-4,23,24 * the whole document * | [Y] - GRABSTEIN K H ET AL, "CLONING OF A T CELL GROWTH FACTOR THAT INTERACTS WITH THE BETA CHAIN OF THE INTERLEUKIN-2 RECEPTOR", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19940513), vol. 264, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 965 - 968, XP002004280 [Y] 2-4,23,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8178155 | Examination | WO03040164 | WO03039225 |