EP1844136 - STEM CELLS CULTURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HADASIT MEDICAL RESEARCH SERVICES AND DEVELOPMENT LTD. Kiryat Hadassah, P.O. Box 12000 91120 Jerusalem / IL | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN SHUSHAN, Etti 7/16 Hazionut Street 96741 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
TANNENBAUM, Shelly 2/4 Hate'ena Street 90435 Efrat / IL | 03 /
ITSYKSON, Pavel 16/4 Hagat Street 52603 Ramat Gan / IL | 04 /
BANIN, Eyal 13 Hanamer Street, Malcha 96954 Jerusalem / IL | 05 /
REUBINOFF, Benjamin Moshav Bar-Giora 99880 Doar Na Haela / IL | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Webber, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05821535.1 | 29.12.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005IL01397 | Priority number, date | US20040639809P | 29.12.2004 Original published format: US 639809 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006070370 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844136 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844136 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0621 (EP,US);
C12N2500/32 (EP,US);
C12N2500/38 (EP,US);
C12N2500/44 (EP,US);
C12N2500/90 (EP,US);
C12N2500/98 (EP,US);
C12N2500/99 (US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,US);
C12N2502/13 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | C12N5/00, C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | STAMMZELLENKULTURSYSTEME | [2007/42] | English: | STEM CELLS CULTURE SYSTEMS | [2007/42] | French: | SYSTEMES DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 08.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2014 | 04.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11174157.5 / EP2410043 | EP11174158.3 / EP2410044 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2005 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | IE | 29.12.2014 | LU | 29.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003161818 (WEISS MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-17,72-75 * claims 1-43 * [Y] 9,19; | [XY]US2004136967 (WEISS MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-17,72-75 * claims 1-46 * [Y] 9,19; | [Y] - AMIT M ET AL, "Human feeder layers for human embryonic stem cells", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF REPRODUCTION, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (2003), vol. 68, ISSN 0006-3363, pages 2150 - 2156, XP002978486 [Y] 1-9,11-17,19,72-75 * page 2150, column R, paragraph 6 - page 2152, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod.102.012583 | [Y] - YE Z -Q ET AL, "Establishment of an adherent cell feeder layer from human umbilical cord blood for support of long-term hematopoietic progenitor cell growth", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12140 - 12144, XP002393848 [Y] 1-8,11-17,72-75 * page 12141, column R, paragraph L - page 12142, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.25.12140 | [A] - BODNAR MEGAN S ET AL, "Propagation and maintenance of undifferentiated human embryonic stem cells.", STEM CELLS AND DEVELOPMENT. JUN 2004, (200406), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 1547-3287, pages 243 - 253, XP009070722 [A] 1-19,49,59,72-78 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/154732804323099172 | [A] - RICHARDS M ET AL, "Human feeders support prolonged undifferentiated growth of human inner cell masses and embryonic stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020805), vol. 20, no. 9, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 933 - 936, XP002979805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt726 | [A] - KOEHLER T ET AL, "Defining optimum conditions for the ex vivo expansion of human umbilical cord blood cells. Influences of progenitor enrichment, interference with feeder layers, early-acting cytokines and agitation of culture vessels", STEM CELLS, ALPHAMED PRESS, DAYTON, OH, US, (1999), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 19 - 24, XP002177251 | Examination | - NAKAMURA HIROSHI ET AL, Morphologic evaluation of the antitumor activity of photodynamic therapy (PDT) using mono-L-aspartyl chlorin e6 (NPe6) against uterine cervical carcinoma cell lines., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF GYNECOLOGICAL CANCER : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL GYNECOLOGICAL CANCER SOCIETY 2002 MAR-APR LNKD- PUBMED:11975677, VOL. 12, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 177 - 186, (200203), ISSN 1048-891X | - CHANG K H ET AL, "BLASTOCYST FORMATION, KARYOTYPE, AND MITOCHONDRIAL DNA OF INTERSPECIES EMBRYOS DERIVED FROM NUCLEAR TRANSFER OF HUMAN CORD FIBROBLASTS INTO ENUCLEATED BOVINE OOCYTES", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.FERTNSTERT.2003.07.006, (20031201), vol. 80, no. 6, ISSN 0015-0282, pages 1380 - 1387, XP001212609 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2003.07.006 | - FRYER D G ET AL, "Human endothelium in cell culture", JOURNAL OF ATHEROSCLEROSIS RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0368-1319(66)80019-4, vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 0368-1319, (19660301), pages 151 - 163, (19660301), XP022811927 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0368-1319(66)80019-4 |