EP1844222 - DUAL-CHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOODT, Florian Dr. Bockemüller-Ring 41 38173 Sickte / DE | 02 /
SCHWEIZER, Marc-Jochen Dürerstrasse 27 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
KLOFT, Manfred Am Sohl 14 38154 Königslutter / DE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Kandlbinder, Markus Christian Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Kandlbinder, Markus Christian Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05821672.2 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005EP13730 | Priority number, date | DE20051004122 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005004122 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079403 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844222 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844222 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/04, F02B37/14, F02B37/16 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
F02B37/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/04 (EP,US);
F02B37/14 (EP,US);
F02B29/0475 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT DOPPELAUFLADUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU BETREIBEN DIESER | [2007/42] | English: | DUAL-CHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | [2007/42] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A DOUBLE SURALIMENTATION, ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CE MOTEUR | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | IT | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | NL | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | AT | 20.12.2010 | LU | 20.12.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
TR | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
AT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 22.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01208520 ; | [A]US4730457 (YAMADA TAKEMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4202077 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4320045 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * columns 2,3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19928523 (HAGMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10332989 (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891117), vol. 013, no. 514, Database accession no. (M - 894), & JP01208520 A 19890822 (HITACHI LTD; others: 01) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3227459 | US4903488 |