EP1831653 - FLÜSSIGKEITSPEGELSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/37] | CAPACITIVE LIQUID LEVEL SENSOR | ||
[2017/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2017/25] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeck, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARLESI, Lorenzo Quai de Brabant, 15 B-6000 Charleroi / BE | 02 /
CHIAFFI, Michel Rue de Bethencourtel, 311 F-60600 Breuil Le Vert / FR | 03 /
NAYDENOV, Volodia Rue Emile Goes 7/202 B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
BARLESI, Lorenzo Quai de Brabant, 15 B-6000 Charleroi / BE | ||
02 /
CHIAFFI, Michel Rue de Bethencourtel, 311 F-60600 Breuil Le Vert / FR | Representative(s) | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2017/25] |
Former [2012/27] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/37] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05821695.3 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP56967 | Priority number, date | EP20040106867 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04106867 | [2007/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006067148 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831653 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831653 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G01F23/268 (EP,US);
G01F23/26 (KR);
G01F23/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CAPACITIVE LIQUID LEVEL SENSOR | [2017/02] | English: | FLÜSSIGKEITSPEGELSENSOR | [2017/02] | French: | CAPTEUR CAPACITIF DE NIVEAU D'UN LIQUIDE | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/37] | FLÜSSIGKEITSPEGELSENSOR | ||
Former [2007/37] | CAPACITIVE LIQUID LEVEL SENSOR | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2005 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | GB | 20.12.2017 | IE | 20.12.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.12.2005 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.12.2005 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2005 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3952593 (ELLS EDWARD G) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 1 - line 24 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 68 * * column 9, line 32 - line 48 * * figure 6 *; | [AD]US4296630 (JUNG WILHELM, et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - line 51; figure 1 * * column 2, line 38 - line 66 * * column 5, line 45 - line 68 *; | [A]WO9910714 (MILLENNIUM SENSORS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 28 * * page 15, line 18 - page 19, line 14 * * page 21, line 29 - page 22, line 12 ** figure 7 *; | [A]US6578416 (VOGEL STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 53 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 47 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1435512 (ALUBO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 9 * * column 15, paragraph 66 - column 16, paragraph 67 * * figures 14-16 * |