|
25.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
22.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.08.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |