29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
19.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.04.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.12.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
Change - English title |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
13.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.07.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2015 |
First examination report |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
12.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
10.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
10.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
04.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|