Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011120219 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | WO2005EP56967 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101285460B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2013 | B1 | KR20070092967 | 14.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | WO2005EP56967 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008524618 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | WO2005EP56967 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1831653 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B1 | EP1831653 | 12.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05821695 | 20.12.2005 | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | WO2005EP56967 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0519383 | 20.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | WO2005EP56967 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006067148 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2006 | A3 | WO2006067148 | 29.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1677083 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100470212C | 18.03.2009 | C | CN101120236 | 06.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04106867 | 22.12.2004 |