26.07.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
10.04.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
31.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2010 |
First examination report |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
14.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
12.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
10.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
27.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|