EP1830923 - RADIOTHERAPEUTIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elekta AB (publ) P.O. Box 7593 103 93 Stockholm / SE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUTAALA, Miikka Meritie 45 C 9 FIN-02470 Upinniemi / FI | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Oak House Oak End Way Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 8BR / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05821711.8 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP13489 | Priority number, date | GB20040028023 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: GB 0428023 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066792 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830923 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61B8/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G01S7/52036 (EP,US);
A61N5/103 (EP,US);
G01S15/8936 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADIOTHERAPIE-GERÄT | [2007/37] | English: | RADIOTHERAPEUTIC APPARATUS | [2007/37] | French: | APPAREIL DE RADIOTHERAPIE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5810007 (HOLUPKA EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 6, line 67 *; | [X]EP1088524 (LIFE IMAGING SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US6530873 (LEE EVA K [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03039370 (COMPUTERIZED MED SYST INC [US]) [X] 1,5,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0062] *; | [X]US2003229282 (BURDETTE EVERETTE C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2004218797 (LADAK HANIF M [CA], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * | Examination | WO9520912 | WO0209588 | US6585647 |