EP1828649 - PRESSURISED FLUID CYLINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luxfer Gas Cylinders Limited Anchorage Gateway 5 Anchorage Quay Salford M50 3XE / GB | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Luxfer Gas Cylinders Limited The Victoria 150-182 Harbour City Salford Quays Salford M50 3SP / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Luxfer, Inc. 3016 Kansas Avenue Riverside, CA 92507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLROYD, Nigel John Henry 1505 Via Tioga Riverside, California 92506 / US | 02 /
KAY, Francis Xavier The Old School House, Church Hill Akeley, Buckinghamshire MK18 5HB / GB | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2008/04] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn GB-London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05821809.0 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005GB50256 | Priority number, date | GB20040028219 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: GB 0428219 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006067527 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828649 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828649 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30, F17C13/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F16K1/303 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,GB,KR,US);
F16K17/40 (GB);
F16K1/306 (EP,US);
F16K1/308 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0114 (EP,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0619 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0646 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0663 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0169 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0308 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0323 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | DRUCKFLUIDZYLINDER | [2007/36] | English: | PRESSURISED FLUID CYLINDERS | [2007/36] | French: | BOUTEILLES DE FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2005 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | LU | 21.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 21.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 21.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 21.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
PT | 30.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3243083 (ARTHUR REYNOLDS ANTHONY, et al); | [DA]US5144973 (GREEN J KENNETH [US], et al); | [DXA]GB2298026 (KAY FRANCIS XAVIER [GB]); | [A]US2003075700 (GIROUARD ERICK [CA], et al); | [DY]WO2004051388 (F X K PATENTS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2004144803 (BAKER GEORGE D [US]) | by applicant | US3930517 | US4077422 | US4907617 | US5144973 | GB2298026 | US5894859 | US6230737 | WO2004051388 |