EP1839365 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMMA, Hiroki HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05822735.6 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005JP24179 | Priority number, date | JP20040370773 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004370773 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068318 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1839365 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2007/40] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2007/40] | French: | SYSTEME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]JP2004362995 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [PX] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9944252 (HYDROGEN BURNER TECHN INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 6, line 3 - page 10, line 19 * * figures 1a,1b *; | [Y]JP2001093564 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS6158176 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5851689 (CHEN TAN-PING [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 50 - line 63 *; | [A]US6348280 (MAEDA HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 41 - column 10, line 35; figures 5-8 *; | [A]JPS60205972 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002302785 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | WO2005060029 |