EP1830810 - SPRAY-DRIED COMPOSITION CONTAINING COLLECTIN FAMILY PROTEINS OR VARIANTS THEROF AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dobeel Co., Ltd. 406 Byucksantechnopia 434-6 Sangdaewon-dong Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si, Kyonggi-do 462-716 / KR | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOON, Hong Mo 103-1101 Byucksan Apt. 295-3, Hoeduck-dong Kwangju-si, Kyonggi-do 464-120 / KR | 02 /
YUM, Jung Sun, 115-502 Chunggu Apt. Hansol Mael Jungja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Kyonggi-do 463-914 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Byung Cheol 403-1403 Bosung I World, Jukjeon 1-dong Suji-gu, Yongin-si, Kyonggi-do 448-542 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Joo Youn T-1202 Pungrim I-one, Seohyun-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Kyonggi-do 463-862 / KR | 05 /
MOON, Je Young, 102-1003 Samik Apt. 152-3 Sangdaewon-dong Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Kyonggi-do 462-120 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hyunjung 129-903 Kolon Apt. Jangmi-Mael, Yataap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Kyonggi-do 463-788 / KR | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
MOON, Hong Mo 103-1101 Byucksan Apt. 295-3, Hoeduck-dong Kwangju-si, Kyonggi-do 464-120 / KR | ||
02 /
YUM, Jung Sun, 115-502 Chunggu Apt. Hansol Mael Jungja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Kyonggi-do 463-914 / KR | |||
03 /
AHN, Byung Cheol 508-207 Kunyoung Vila Kkachi Mael 13 Kumi-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Kyonggi-do 433-808 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Joo Youn T-1202 Pungrim I-one, Seohyun-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Kyonggi-do 463-862 / KR | |||
05 /
MOON, Je Young, 102-1003 Samik Apt. 152-3 Sangdaewon-dong Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Kyonggi-do 462-120 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Hyunjung 10-204 Siyeong Apt. Jamsil-4dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-794 / KR | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/37] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 05822824.8 | 30.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005KR04682 | Priority number, date | KR20040117100 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040117100 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071102 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830810 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/1732 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61K9/1611 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K9/1658 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRÜHGETROCKNETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PROTEINEN DER COLLECTIN-FAMILIE ODER VARIANTEN DAVON UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/37] | English: | SPRAY-DRIED COMPOSITION CONTAINING COLLECTIN FAMILY PROTEINS OR VARIANTS THEROF AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [2007/37] | French: | PRÉPARATION SÉCHÉE PAR ATOMISATION CONTENANT DES PROTÉINES DE LA FAMILLE DE LA COLLECTINE OU DES VARIANTES DESDITES PROTÉINES, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLABORATION DE LADITE PRÉPARATION | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 30.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 21.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0185137 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * abstract * * examples 1-21; claims 1-45 * [A] 7-24 | International search | [A]WO9524183 (INHALE THERAPEUTIC SYST [US]); | [A]US6770619 (LARSSON MARCUS [SE], et al) | by applicant | KR20040106194 | WO0185137 | WO9524183 | US6770619 | - HANS-JURGEN ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 3, page 1143 | - HARTSHORN, K. L. ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1993), vol. 91, page 1414 | - KASE, T. ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 97, page 385 | - EZEKOWITZ, R. A. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1989), vol. 169, page 185 | - HAURUM, J. C. ET AL., AIDS, (1993), vol. 7, page 1307 | - FISCHER, C. B. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 39, page 439 | - KSIAZEK, T. G. ET AL., N ENG. J MED., (2003), vol. 348, page 1953 | - PEIRIS, J. S. M. ET AL., LANCET, (2003), vol. 361, page 1319 | - NETH, O. ET AL., INFECT. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 68, page 688 | - VAN E. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 97, page 411 | - TABONA, P. ET AL., IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 85, page 153 | - TREGOAT, V. ET AL., J CLIN. LAB. ANAL., (2002), vol. 16, no. 6, page 304 | - WAKAMIYA, N. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1992), vol. 187, page 1270 | - HARTLEY, C. A. ET AL., J VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, page 4358 | - PATRICK, C. R. ET AL., J VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, page 8204 | - SCHWARTZ, P. L. ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1973), vol. 92, no. 6, page 1795 | - KOSEKI, T. ET AL., J BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 107, page 389 | - BROADHEAD, J. ET AL., DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (1992), vol. 18, no. 11, 12, page 1169 | - LABRUDE, P. ET AL., J PHARM. SCI., (1989), vol. 78, no. 3, page 223 | - MUMENTHALER, M. ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1994), vol. 11, no. 1, page 12 | - BOSQUILLON, C., J CONT. REL., (2004), vol. 96, page 233 | - MUMENTHALER. M., PHARM. RES., (1994), vol. 11, no. 1, page 12 | - CHAN, H. K. ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1997), vol. 14, no. 4, page 431 | - CODRONS, V. ET AL., J PHARM. SCI., (2003), vol. 92, no. 5, page 938 | - MAA, Y. F. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 60, no. 3, page 301 | - HICKEY, A. J ET AL., PHARM. TECH., (1994), vol. 18, page 58 | - MAA, Y. F. ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1998), vol. 15, no. 5, page 768 | - ANDYA, J. D. ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1999), vol. 16, no. 3, page 350 | - MAA, Y. F. ET AL., PHARM. DEV. TECH., (1997), vol. 2, no. 3, page 213 | - ANDERSON, SCAND. J IMMUNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 32, page 81 | - USHIJIMA ET AL., JPN. J CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 83, page 458 | - ZIMMERMAN ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 89, page 143 | - MCNEELY, J INFECT. DIS., (1993), page 91 | - KUAN ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 90, page 97 |