EP1820328 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A UNIFIED CALL JOURNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78 Rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states France Telecom 6, place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILLEUL, Nicolas 9, rue de la Corderie F-14440 Douvres La Delivrande / FR | 02 /
KERDRAON, Alan 9, résidence Olympia F-14000 Caen / FR | 03 /
REBILLON, Jacques-Olivier 24, route du Pont du Coudray F-14220 Mutrecy / FR | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
BAILLEUL, Nicolas 9, rue de la Corderie F-14440 Douvres La Delivrande / FR | ||
02 /
KERDRAON, Alan 9, résidence Olympia F-14000 Caen / FR | |||
03 /
REBILLON, Jacques-Olivier 11, avenue Mme de Ségur, Appt 273 F-14000 Caen / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/04] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/34] | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05823025.1 | 29.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005FR02966 | Priority number, date | FR20040013091 | 08.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413091 | [2007/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061484 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820328 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820328 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/22 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
H04M3/2218 (EP);
H04M2207/20 (EP);
H04M3/382 (EP);
H04M3/42042 (EP);
H04M3/42178 (EP);
H04M3/42195 (EP);
H04M7/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/40] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EINHEITLICHES ANRUFLOGBUCHVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2018/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A UNIFIED CALL JOURNAL | [2007/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE JOURNAL UNIFIÉ DES APPELS | [2018/41] |
Former [2007/34] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR EIN EINHEITLICHES ANRUFPROTOKOLL | ||
Former [2007/34] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE JOURNAL UNIFIE DES APPELS | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2005 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | IE | 29.11.2019 | LU | 29.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.11.2005 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0978983 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-11* paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0014] , [0020] *; | [X]WO03063519 (KAPSCH CARRIERCOM AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 24 * |