EP1829309 - RECEPTION OF A SIGNAL TRANSMITTED OVER A TRANSMISSION LINK COMPRISING CODED CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLER, Marc François Henri Société Civile SPID, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
MELLIER, Arnaud Ange René Société Civile SPID, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane GB-Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05823262.0 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005IB54124 | Priority number, date | EP20040300882 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04300882 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064423 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829309 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829309 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H04L25/03006 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03535 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03726 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANG VON ÜBER EINE ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERBINDUNG MIT KODIERTEN KANÄLEN GESENDETEN DATEN | [2007/36] | English: | RECEPTION OF A SIGNAL TRANSMITTED OVER A TRANSMISSION LINK COMPRISING CODED CHANNELS | [2007/36] | French: | RECEPTION D'UN SIGNAL TRANSMIS PAR UN CHAINON DE VOIE DE TRANSMISSION COMPRENANT DES VOIES CODEES | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | IE | 08.12.2008 | LU | 08.12.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CY | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
TR | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IE | 08.12.2008 | ||
LU | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IE | 08.12.2008 | ||
LU | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IE | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IE | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IE | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6028901 (HUYNH LONG [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2002015401 (SUBRAMANIAN RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2003048838 (SEXTON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract * |