EP1809261 - NON-GELATIN SOFT CAPSULE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. Scherer Technologies, LLC c/o CSC Services of Nevada, Inc. 520 East John Street Carson City, NV 89706 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states R.P. Scherer Technologies, LLC C/o CSC Services of Nevada, Inc. 502 East John Street Carson City, NV 89706 / US | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states R.P. Scherer Technologies, LLC 7690 Cheyenne Avenue, Suite 100 Las Vegas, NV 89129 / US | ||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states R.P. Scherer Technologies, Inc. 7690 Cheyenne Avenue, Suite 100 Las Vegas, NV 89129 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELLEY, Rickey, S. 986 Wood Street Largo, FL 34640 / US | 02 /
STROUD, Norman 217 North Bay Hills Boulevard Safety Harbor, FL 34695 / US | 03 /
YOUNGBLOOD, Elizabeth 5120 Rolling Fairway Drive Valrico, FL 33595 / US | 04 /
TANNER, Keith 1600 Huntington Lane Safety Harbor, FL 34695 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2007/30] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida, p/o De Vries & Metman, Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 05823349.5 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US38532 | Priority number, date | US20040984205 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: US 984205 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006052452 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809261 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809261 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K9/66 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | 27.04.2007 | BA | 27.04.2007 | HR | 27.04.2007 | MK | 27.04.2007 | YU | 27.04.2007 | Title | German: | GELATINEFREIES WEICHKAPSELSYSTEM | [2007/30] | English: | NON-GELATIN SOFT CAPSULE SYSTEM | [2007/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE CAPSULE MOLLE NON GELATINEUX | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 24.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2011 | 11.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10194764.6 / EP2289496 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2005 | SI | 14.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/25] | SI | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8802625 (SCHERER CORP R P [US]) [Y] 24 * abstract ** page 9, lines 18,19 *; | [XY]US6340473 (TANNER KEITH EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15,19-23,25-28 * abstract * * column 5, lines 20-48 * * table I * * example 1 * * table IV * * column 11, lines 9-18 * * column 11, lines 30-60 * * column 12, lines 31-33 * [Y] 13,16-18,24; | [Y]WO0217855 (SCHERER TECHNOLOGIES INC R P [US], et al) [Y] 13,16-18 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 7, lines 1-7 * * page 6, lines 1-8 *; | [PX]WO2005065665 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-12,14,15,19-23,25-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0030] - [0032] * | International search | [A]US5071643 (YU MAN S [US], et al); | [A]US5376688 (MORTON FRANK S S [US], et al); | [A]US5505961 (SHELLEY RICKEY S [US], et al) | Examination | - SORASUCHART W ET AL, "Drug release from spray layered and coated drug-containing beads: Effects of pH and comparison of different dissolution methods", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY 1999 US LNKD- DOI:10.1081/DDC-100102274, (1999), vol. 25, no. 10, ISSN 0363-9045, pages 1093 - 1098 | - Whistler, Roy, L., Paschall, Eugene, F., Starch Chemistry and Technology, New York, London, Academic Press 1965, Vol. 1, pages 521-533, (1965), ISSN 0363-9045 | by applicant | WO8802625 | US5071643 | US5360615 | US6340473 | WO0217855 | WO2005065665 |