Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006067511 | ![]() | 29.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005061719 | ![]() | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005061718 | ![]() | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018105818 | ![]() | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | US201213474317 | 17.05.2012 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | US58442407 | 10.04.2007 | US201715654252 | 19.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016186192 | ![]() | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514605314 | 26.01.2015 | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | US201213474313 | 17.05.2012 | US72253907 | 22.06.2007 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8969064 | ![]() | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2012231505 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | US201213474313 | 17.05.2012 | US72253907 | 22.06.2007 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012231503 | ![]() | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | US201213474317 | 17.05.2012 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | US58442407 | 10.04.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8252551 | ![]() | 28.08.2012 | B2 | US2008261861 | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9057061 | ![]() | 16.06.2015 | B2 | US2008193977 | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007275889 | ![]() | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101298157B | ![]() | 21.08.2013 | B1 | KR20070004585 | 09.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101262682B | ![]() | 15.05.2013 | B1 | KR20070005568 | 10.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5631533B | ![]() | 26.11.2014 | B2 | JP2008525007 | 17.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5052899B | ![]() | 17.10.2012 | B2 | JP2007515962 | 21.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4964596B | ![]() | 04.07.2012 | B2 | JP2007515961 | 21.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2330200 | ![]() | 05.04.2017 | B1 | EP2330200 | 28.12.2011 | A3 | EP2330200 | 08.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | EP05823505 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2048236 | ![]() | 20.03.2013 | B1 | EP2048236 | 15.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | EP04806256 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1711602 | ![]() | 06.10.2010 | B1 | EP1711602 | 18.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1709181 | ![]() | 28.01.2009 | B1 | EP1709181 | 11.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008202538 | ![]() | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | AU2008202538 | 06.06.2008 | AU2004303601 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005317828 | ![]() | 29.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004303601C | ![]() | 08.01.2009 | C1 | AU2004303601B | 06.03.2008 | B2 | AU2004303601 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004303597C | ![]() | 14.05.2009 | C1 | AU2004303597B | 25.09.2008 | B2 | AU2004303597 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1831375 | ![]() | 16.07.2014 | B1 | EP1831375 | 12.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE421994T | 15.02.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE483812T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2551496 | 09.12.2014 | C | CA2551496 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2551503 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101128587B | 12.02.2014 | B | CN101128587 | 20.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005GB05085 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101818121 | 01.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1922325B | 09.06.2010 | B | CN1922325 | 28.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1922326B | 09.02.2011 | B | CN1922326 | 28.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004019304D1 | 19.03.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004029503D1 | 18.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1711602T | 31.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2048236T | 21.05.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | EP04806256 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2330200T | 24.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | EP05823505 | 23.12.2005 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2321948T | 15.06.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0329681D0 | 28.01.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0329722D0 | 28.01.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2424888 | 26.03.2008 | B | GB2424888 | 11.10.2006 | A | GB0614610D0 | 30.08.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2424889 | 11.10.2006 | A | GB0614614D0 | 30.08.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1099938 | 31.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | WO2004GB05462 | 23.12.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ548154 | 31.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05435 | 23.12.2004 | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG149003 | 29.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG182155 | 30.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200605588 | 25.02.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0329681 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200605589 | 27.12.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0329722 | 23.12.2003 | Type | ![]() | EP2330200 |