EP1952064 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE DELIVERY OF A COMBUSTIBLE GAS TO A BURNER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sit la Precisa S.p.a. Via dell'Industria, 31/33 35129 Padova / IT | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANELLA, Stefano Via Palladio, 12 I-31044 Montebelluna / IT | 02 /
TURRIN, Gianpiero Via Beato Pellegrino, 152 I-35100 Padova / IT | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via Matteotti 26 35137 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 05823562.3 | 23.11.2005 | [2008/32] | WO2005IT00686 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060696 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1952064 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F23K5/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F23K5/007 (EP,US);
F23N1/005 (EP,US);
F23K2400/201 (EP,US);
F23N2235/14 (EP,US);
F23N2235/18 (EP,US);
F23N2235/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/51] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER ZUFUHR EINES BRENNBAREN GASES AN EINE BRENNERVORRICHTUNG | [2008/32] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE DELIVERY OF A COMBUSTIBLE GAS TO A BURNER APPARATUS | [2008/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FOURNITURE D'UN GAZ COMBUSTIBLE À UN APPAREIL À BRÛLEUR | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 24.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE4339489 (LANDIS & GYR BUSINESS SUPPORT [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,8; | [Y]EP0159393 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 3,8 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE4038445 (KROMSCHROEDER AG G [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * column 1, line 3 - line 15 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 62; figure . *; | [A]DE4140774 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9822753 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure 1A * |