EP1816998 - FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CERAMIDES AND/OR PSEUDOCERAMIDES AND (ALPHA-)BISABOLOL FOR COMBATING SKIN DAMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIELHABER, Gabriele Pollmannsgrund 22 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05823823.9 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005EP56156 | Priority number, date | US20040630433P | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 630433 P | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006053912 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816998 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816998 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K31/164 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/68 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/005 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/004 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/04 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN MIT CERAMIDEN UND/ODER PSEUDOCERAMIDEN UND (ALPHA-)BISABOLOL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTSCHÄDEN | [2007/33] | English: | FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CERAMIDES AND/OR PSEUDOCERAMIDES AND (ALPHA-)BISABOLOL FOR COMBATING SKIN DAMAGE | [2007/33] | French: | FORMULES COMPRENANT DES CÉRAMIDES ET/OU DES PSEUDOCÉRAMIDES ET DE L`ALPHA-BISABOLOL ET APPLICATION À LA RÉPARATION DE PEAU ENDOMMAGÉE | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.2009 | BE | 18.03.2009 | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IT | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | PT | 27.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | IE | 22.11.2009 | LU | 22.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5391373 (MAUSNER JACK [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 8, lines 60-67 * * column 10, lines 32-43; table 1 *; | [X]EP0785952 (FABRE PIERRE DERMO COSMETIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-17 * page 4, lines 12-15 * * page 12, lines 15-40 *; | [X]US5882665 (MEYERS ALAN JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 1, lines 12-14; example 2 *; | [X]US6335388 (FOTINOS SPIROS [GR]) [X] 1-17 * column 7, lines 46-50; examples 9,11 *; | [X]US6495123 (FARYNIARZ JOSEPH RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-17 * table I *; | [X]WO03075862 (ACCANTIA HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-17* example 8 *; | [X]US2004076660 (PADLO EWA URSZULA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-17 * example 1 * | by applicant | WO9400127 | - WIX ET AL., COMP. BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL. B., (1987), vol. 86, pages 671 - 673 | - "The Chemistry of Natural and Synthetic Skin Barrier Lipids. In: Jungermann E., Cosmetic Science and Technology", MÖLLER H., Cosmetic Lipids and the Skin Barrier, MARCEL DEKKER, (2002), vol. 24, pages 1 - 35 | - PARK ET AL., SOFW-JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 127, pages 10 - 18 |