EP1828269 - HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED CATIONIC POLYMERS AND THEIR USE AS CLEANING AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Zhiqiang 2 Stuart Drive Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 02 /
JAYNES, Bingham Scott 4 Overhill Lane New City, NY 10956 / US | 03 /
MAO, Jianwen 50 Boxwood Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 04 /
PREUSS, Andrea Hochstrasse 35 CH-4053 Basel / CH | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/43] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05823845.2 | 28.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP56256 | Priority number, date | US20040635195P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 635195 P | US20050685235P | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 685235 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061334 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828269 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828269 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C11D3/3769 (EP,US);
C08F20/00 (KR);
C08F20/04 (KR);
C08F20/06 (KR);
C08F226/04 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHOB MODIFIZIERTE KATIONISCHE POLYMERE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS REINIGUNGSHILFSMITTEL | [2007/36] | English: | HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED CATIONIC POLYMERS AND THEIR USE AS CLEANING AIDS | [2007/36] | French: | POLYMERES CATIONIQUES A MODIFICATION HYDROPHOBE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AUXILIAIRES DE NETTOYAGE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2011 | BE | 26.01.2011 | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 26.01.2011 | |
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4835234 (VALINT PAUL L [US], et al) [X] 1-15* examples 26,27 * | Examination | WO9220462 |