EP1964279 - TOKEN BASED RADIO RESOURCE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZMI, Muhammad Svartviksslingan 110, 3 tr SE-167 39 Bromma / SE | 02 /
LIAO, Jingyi 9A, Hanwei Plaza, No. 7 Guanghua Road Chaoyang District Beijing 10000 / CN | [2012/06] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
KAZMI, Muhammad Svartviksslingan 110, 3 tr SE-167 39 Bromma / SE | ||
02 /
LIAO, Jingyi 9A, Hanwei Plaza, No. 7 Guanghua Road Chaoyang District Beijing 10000 / CN | |||
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
KAZMI, Muhammad Knypplerskevägen 12 S-168 38 Bromma / SE | ||
02 /
LIAO, Jingyi 9A, Hanwei Plaza, No. 7 Guanghua Road Chaoyang District Beijing 10000 / CN | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05823894.0 | 22.12.2005 | [2008/36] | WO2005SE02031 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073267 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964279 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964279 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/34, // H04W52/06 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP,US);
H04W52/243 (US);
H04W52/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | AUF TOKEN BASIERENDE FUNKBETRIEBSMITTELVERWALTUNG | [2008/36] | English: | TOKEN BASED RADIO RESOURCE MANAGEMENT | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES RADIO PAR JETON | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2005 | AT | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6226281 (CORDIER CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US2005105589 (SUNG SANG-HOON [KR], et al) [DA] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0022]; figures 4A,4B * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0085]; figures 6A,6B * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0022]; figures 4A,4B * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0085]; figures 6A,6B * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0022]; figures 4A,4B * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] ** paragraphs [0083] - [0085]; figures 6A,6B *; | [A]EP1603251 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * |