EP1806007 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BALANCING WIRELESS ACCESS BASED ON CENTRALIZED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAVALKOVSKY, Arthur 7a Hasahlav Street Ramat Poleg, 42207 Netanya / IL | 02 /
STIEGLITZ, Jeremy 1066 Laurel Street Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
SCHIEBER, Ami 61 Mendes Street 52653 Ramat-Gan / IL | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05824055.7 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US38831 | Priority number, date | US20040974418 | 26.10.2004 Original published format: US 974418 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047699 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1806007 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSGLEICHEN VON DRAHTLOSEM ZUGANG AUF DER BASIS VON ZENTRALISIERTEN INFORMATIONEN | [2007/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BALANCING WIRELESS ACCESS BASED ON CENTRALIZED INFORMATION | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EQUILIBRER L'ACCES SANS FIL SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS CENTRALISEES | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 25.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003133420 (HADDAD WASSIM [GB]) [X] 1-4,8,15-19,23,30 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * [I] 5-7,9-14,20-22,24-29; | [X]EP1408653 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - line 40 * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0112] *; | [I] - VICTOR ALEO, "Load Distribution In IEEE 802.11 Cells", INTERNET CITATION, (200303), URL: STOCKHOLM http://www.it.kth.se/ victor/victor_load_distribution_WLAN_thesis_new.pdf, (20041103), XP002303667 [I] 1-30 * paragraph [2.3.1.2] * | International search | [AP]US2005050010 (LINDEN ROBBERT C VAN DER [US]) | by applicant | US2003133420 | EP1408653 |