EP1957343 - STEERING ASSEMBLY FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT TRUCKS 99 route de Lyon 69800 St Priest / FR | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUE, Emmanuel 44, cours Tolstoï F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Putet, Gilles, et al RENAULT TRUCKS VTEC France - Corporate Patents TER E70 2 12 99, route de Lyon 69806 Saint Priest Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Putet, Gilles, et al RENAULT TRUCKS VTEC France - Corporate Patents TER E70 2 12 99, route de Lyon 69806 Saint Priest Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Putet, Gilles RENAULT TRUCKS Volvo Technology-Corporate Patents TER E80 1 10 99, Route de Lyon 69806 Saint Priest / FR | Application number, filing date | 05824556.4 | 01.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005EP14207 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062684 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957343 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957343 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/18 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
B62D7/18 (EP);
B60G2200/44 (EP);
B60G2300/14 (EP);
B60G2300/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKANORDNUNG FÜR EIN AUTOMOBIL | [2008/34] | English: | STEERING ASSEMBLY FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE | [2008/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE DIRECTION POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | IE | 01.12.2010 | LU | 01.12.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GB | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | ES | 09.01.2011 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LU | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LU | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0181153 (BOLER CO [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * abstract * * page 3, lines 5-11 * * page 5, line 7 - page 5, line 26 * * page 6, lines 17-21 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 11 * * page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 17 * [I] 6-9; | [I]US2005067805 (KIM GEUN-BAE [KR]) [I] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0015] - [0019] - [0025] - [0040] - [0042] , [0045] * |