EP1830707 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRICKING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRISS, Patrick Schulgasse 5 8112 Otelfingen / CH | 02 /
ZIPFEL, Marzellinus Maierbuckallee 13 79112 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
LOPEZ, Angel Walther-Rathenau-Str. 68 75180 Pforzheim / DE | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
GRISS, Patrick Rötelstrasse 126 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
ZIPFEL, Marzellinus Maierbuckallee 13 79112 Freiburg / DE | |||
03 /
LOPEZ, Angel Walther-Rathenau-Str. 68 75180 Pforzheim / DE | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05824859.2 | 10.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP13266 | Priority number, date | EP20040029926 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04029926 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066744 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830707 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830707 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61M37/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/1405 (KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
Y10T29/302 (EP,US);
Y10T29/304 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49812 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53339 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12188 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STECHELEMENTS | [2007/37] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRICKING ELEMENT | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ELEMENT DE PIQUAGE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IE | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | AT | 10.12.2011 | LU | 10.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
AT | 10.12.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
AT | 10.12.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4777096 (BORYSKO EMIL [US]) [X] 1-7,11-18 * column 4, line 23 - line 54; figures 5,7 * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]EP0445820 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 19-26 * column 1, line 55 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 * [Y] 8-10; | [A]US6406638 (STOEBER BORIS [US], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004008203 (REDFERN INTEGRATED OPTICS PTY [AU], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document * |