EP1834446 - MAINTAINING CONSISTENT NETWORK CONNECTIONS WHILE MOVING THROUGH WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azaire Networks Inc. 4800 Great America Parkway, Suite 515 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANT, Nishi 3032 Vin Grande Ct. San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 02 /
RALLAPALLI, Atchuta 440 Davis Ct 1902 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Targett, Kenneth Stanley 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825129.9 | 18.11.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US42239 | Priority number, date | US20040629855P | 18.11.2004 Original published format: US 629855 P | US20050705224P | 03.08.2005 Original published format: US 705224 P | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055939 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834446 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/66 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
H04W8/087 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/00 (GB);
H04L12/28 (GB);
H04W36/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/12 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H04W40/02 (KR);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W76/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/082 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFRECHTERHALTUNG VON BESTÄNDIGEN NETZWERKVERBINDUNGEN WÄHREND EINER BEWEGUNG DURCH DRAHTLOSE NETZWERKE | [2007/38] | English: | MAINTAINING CONSISTENT NETWORK CONNECTIONS WHILE MOVING THROUGH WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2007/38] | French: | MAINTIEN DE LA COHERENCE DE CONNEXIONS RESEAU PENDANT UN DEPLACEMENT DANS DES RESEAUX SANS FIL | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9917499 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]US2002136226 (CHRISTOFFEL THOMAS W [US], et al); | [A]WO02093811 (ADJUNGO NETWORKS LTD [IL], et al); | [X]WO03019840 (BAMBOO MEDIACASTING INC [US], et al); | [X]WO03105380 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al); | [DA]US2004139201 (CHAUDHARY MAYANK S [US], et al); | [PA]WO2005032083 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US2002150091 (LOPPONEN JUSSI [FI], et al); | [A]US2005007984 (SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US], et al) |