EP1812032 - TISSUE FACTOR COMPOSITION AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRISSEY, James H. 2605 Willoughby Road Champagn, Illinois 61822 / US | 02 /
PUREZA, Vincent S. 1901 Southwood Drive Champaign, Illinois 61821 / US | 03 /
SLIGAR, Stephen G. 401 W. Michigan Avenue Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/31] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825139.8 | 27.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005US38781 | Priority number, date | US20040622737P | 27.10.2004 Original published format: US 622737 P | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047684 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1812032 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, C07K14/00, C07K14/745, A61K38/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/745 (EP);
A61K38/363 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/5123 (EP);
A61K9/5169 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | A61K38/00, C07K14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBEFAKTORZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2007/31] | English: | TISSUE FACTOR COMPOSITION AND METHODS | [2007/31] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE DE FACTEUR TISSULAIRE ET METHODES ASSOCIEES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0240501 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [XD] 1,2,5,6,13 * claim 23 *; | [XD]US2004053384 (SLIGAR STEPHEN G [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,5,6,13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6132729 ; | [Y] - MCCALLUM C. ET AL., "Tissue factor positions and maintains the factor VIIa active site far above the membrane surface even in the absence of the factor VIIa Gla domain", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, no. 48, pages 30160 - 30166, XP000882821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.48.30160 | [Y] - BACH R. ET AL., "Factor VII binding to tissue factor in reconstituted phospholipid vesicles: induction of cooperativity by phosphatidylserine", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 4007 - 4020, XP000882535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00362a005 | [A] - CARSON S. ET AL., "Coagulation factor III (tissue factor) interaction with phospholipid vesicles induced by cadmium: characterization of the reconstituted protein-membrane complex", BIOSCIENCE REPORTS, (1981), vol. 1, pages 197 - 205, XP008070894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01114905 |