EP1817508 - VEHICLE CAB SUSPENSION DAMPING BUSHING AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states LORD CORPORATION 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARICKMAN, James, R. 4268 West 28th Street Erie, PA 16506-1702 / US | 02 /
KUESTER, Ulrich, A. 16240 Baird Drive Spring Lake, MI 49456-2312 / US | 03 /
FRERI, Nicola Via Donatori Di Sangue, 11 I-25080 Mazzano, Brescia / IT | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05825824.5 | 28.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005US43050 | Priority number, date | US20040631319P | 29.11.2004 Original published format: US 631319 P | US20040640404P | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 640404 P | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006058317 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817508 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817508 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/14, B62D33/06 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B62D33/0604 (EP,US);
F16F13/14 (EP,US);
F16F13/1409 (EP,US);
F16F13/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/01] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSBUCHSE FÜR EINE FÜHRERHAUSAUFHÄNGUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/33] | English: | VEHICLE CAB SUSPENSION DAMPING BUSHING AND METHOD OF MAKING | [2007/33] | French: | COUSSINET AMORTISSEUR DE SUSPENSION DE CABINE DE CONDUCTEUR DE VEHICULE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 30.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 24.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03277845 ; | [X]JPH01279129 ; | [X]JPH06294440 ; | [X]JPS63308243 ; | [X]JPS62224745 ; | [X]US4786036 (KANDA RYOUJI [JP]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US4817926 (SCHWERDT HANS-WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]DE4106214 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5299788 (KANDA RYOUJI [JP]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920313), vol. 016, no. 103, Database accession no. (M - 1221), & JP03277845 A 19911209 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900130), vol. 014, no. 052, Database accession no. (M - 0928), & JP01279129 A 19891109 (KURASHIKI KAKO KK) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06294440 A 19941021 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890411), vol. 013, no. 148, Database accession no. (M - 812), & JP63308243 A 19881215 (MARUGO RUBBER KOGYO KK) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880316), vol. 012, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 677), & JP62224745 A 19871002 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | Examination | EP0009120 |