EP1848775 - ADHESIVE SILICON ELASTOMER SINGLE-COMPONENT COMPOSITION CROSSLINKABLE BY POLYADDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones France 21 Avenue Georges Pompidou Batiment B - Danica 69486 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUCHELON, Alain 2, Rue G. Courteline F-69330 Meyzieu / FR | 02 /
BLANC-MAGNARD, Delphine 7, Avenue Berthelot F-69007 Lyon / FR | 03 /
GEORGE, Catherine 16B, Avenue Guy de Collongue F-69130 Ecully / FR | 04 /
ZANANDREA, Fabio 20, rue d'Essling F-69003 Lyon / FR | [2007/44] | Application number, filing date | 05825983.9 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/44] | WO2005FR03088 | Priority number, date | FR20040013640 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413640 | [2007/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006067294 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848775 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848775 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C09J183/04, C08K5/54 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/70 (KR);
C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C09J183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/28 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/44 (EP,US);
C09J183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/28 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH POLYADDITION VERNETZBARE EINKOMPONENTIGE SILIKONELASTOMERKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2007/44] | English: | ADHESIVE SILICON ELASTOMER SINGLE-COMPONENT COMPOSITION CROSSLINKABLE BY POLYADDITION | [2007/44] | French: | COMPOSITION ELASTOMERE SILICONE, ADHESIVE, MONOCOMPOSANTE ET RETICULABLE PAR POLYADDITION | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5567752 (STEIN JUDITH [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 15 - line 18 * * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 32; example 4; claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0850996 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 10 - line 45 ** page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 5; examples 1,2; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]WO03037987 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 31 * * page 7, line 23 - page 16, line 29 * * page 17, line 10 - line 34; examples 1-6; claims 1,8-20 * |