EP1828841 - TRI-TONE TRIM MASK FOR ALTERNATING PHASE-SHIFT PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75265-5474 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATON, Thomas, J. 15735 Daleport Circle Dallas, Texas 75248 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK91AQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments, Ltd. Patents 800 Pavillon Drive Northampton Business Park Northampton Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05826034.0 | 01.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US43356 | Priority number, date | US20040001165 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: US 1165 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006060504 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828841 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03C5/00, // G03F1/30, G03F1/32 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
G03F1/32 (EP,US);
G03F1/30 (EP,US);
G03F1/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | G03F1/00, G03C5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/51] |
Former [2008/11] | |||
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREITON-TRIMMASKE FÜR DIE PHASENVERSCHIEBUNGSALTERNIERUNGS-FOTOLITHOGRAPHIE | [2007/36] | English: | TRI-TONE TRIM MASK FOR ALTERNATING PHASE-SHIFT PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY | [2007/36] | French: | MASQUE D'AJUSTAGE EN TROIS TONS PERMETTANT D'ALTERNER LA PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIE A DEPHASAGE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2021 | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/19] | 27.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/19] | Appeal following examination | 27.08.2021 | Appeal received No. T2144/21 | 27.08.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 22.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | 25.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004043305 (PARK CHUL-HONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] * * example 1; claims 1, 11, 15, 25, 29, 39 *; | [X]US6711732 (DAI CHANG-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 3a, 3b, 8; claims 1,6 *; | [XI]US2004074868 (CHANG CHUNG-HSING [TW]) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 7; | [X]US2004197677 (KOHLE RODERICK [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0069] * | International search | [X]US2004074868 (CHANG CHUNG-HSING [TW]); | [X]US6551750 (PIERRAT CHRISTOPHE [US]) |