EP1820178 - RETRACTABLE BANNER STAND WITH CURVATURE MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skyline Displays, Inc. 3355 Discovery Road Eagan, MN 55121 / US | [2011/21] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Skyline Displays, Inc. 3355 Dicovery Road Eagan, MN 55121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCHE, Mark A. 503 Chapel Court Eagan, MN 55121 / US | 02 /
BERG, Dan D. 1095 Osceola Avenue Saint Paul, MN 55105 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Jason W. 4214 19th Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55407 / US | 04 /
ELLIOTT, John T. 3931 Turquoise Point Eagan, MN 55122 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05826068.8 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US43145 | Priority number, date | US20040000855 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: US 855 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006060399 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820178 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820178 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09F17/00, G09F11/21 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G09F11/21 (EP,US);
G09F15/0025 (EP,US);
G09F15/0062 (EP,US);
G09F17/00 (EP,US);
G09F2017/0066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | G09F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFAHRBARER PLAKATSTÄNDER MIT KRÜMMUNGSMITTELN | [2007/34] | English: | RETRACTABLE BANNER STAND WITH CURVATURE MEANS | [2007/34] | French: | PORTE-BANNIERE RETRACTABLE A MOYEN DE COURBURE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10181741.9 / EP2267688 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | LU | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ANONYMUS, "ULTIMA displays online catalogue", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040525), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040525042830/http://www.swcl.co.uk/swcl2002/downloads/ultima.pdf, (20090406), XP002522803 [X] 1,3,9-11,16-20 * See "uno boomerang" the curved banner stand * | International search | [Y]US3075805 (GOLDE HANS T, et al); | [Y]US5798861 (DOAT GUY [FR]); | [A]US6115951 (JING JAMES X [US], et al); | [A]US6546990 (PEETERS PIET [NL]); | [Y]US7163044 (KIRBY DAVID A [US]) | by applicant | US5798861 | - ANONYMUS, "ULTIMA displays online catalogue", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040525), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040525042830/http://www.swcl.co.uk/swc12002/downl oads/ultima.pdf |