EP1720585 - A CLOSED VENOUS -CARDIOTOMY RESERVOIR WITH IMPROVED AIR HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/46] | A COLSED VENOUS -CARDIOTOMY RESERVOIR WITH IMPROVED AIR HANDLING | ||
[2014/11] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamari, Yehuda 21 Singworth Street Oyster Bay, NY 11771 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Tamari, Yehuda 21 Singworth Street Oyster Bay NY 11771 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05826776.6 | 24.01.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005US02198 | Priority number, date | US20040538277P | 22.01.2004 Original published format: US 538277 P | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006057650 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720585 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A61M1/3627 (EP,US);
A61M1/3632 (EP,US);
A61M1/3667 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/46] | A61M1/14, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, LI | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENES VENEN-KARDIOTOMIERESERVOIR MIT VERBESSERTER BELÜFTUNG | [2006/46] | English: | A CLOSED VENOUS -CARDIOTOMY RESERVOIR WITH IMPROVED AIR HANDLING | [2014/11] | French: | RESERVOIR DE CARDIOTOMIE ET VEINEUX A CIRCUIT FERME PERMETTANT UNE GESTION AMELIOREE DE L'AIR | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/46] | A COLSED VENOUS -CARDIOTOMY RESERVOIR WITH IMPROVED AIR HANDLING | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | EP11157046.1 / EP2335751 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4643713 (VIITALA DANIEL W [US]); | [Y]US4734269 (CLARKE ROLF W [US], et al); | [A]US5061236 (SUTHERLAND KARL M [US], et al); | [A]US5411705 (THOR ERIC J [US], et al); | [A]US5573526 (HESS PAUL H [US]); | [A]US5935093 (ELGAS ROGER J [US], et al); | [A]US6287270 (FINI MASSIMO [IT]); | [X]US6337049 (TAMARI YEHUDA [US]) |