EP1855770 - EDUCATIONAL GAMES OF CHANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Rangers, Inc. 10 Inverness Center Parkway, Suite 125 Birmingham, AL 35242 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states McGill, Bradley J. 616 Euclid Avenue Birmingham, AL 35213 / US | ||
For all designated states McGreer, Andrew D. 1339 Hardwood Cove Road Birmingham, AL 35242 / US | |||
For all designated states Graeve, Paul Kent 3551 N. Reta Avenue 1 Chicago, IL 60657 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGill, Bradley J. 4012 Old Leeds Circle Birmingham, AL 35242 / US | 02 /
McGreer, Andrew D. 1139 Hardwood Cove Road Birmingham, AL 35242 / US | 03 /
Graeve, Paul Kent 936 East Broadmor Drive Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Röthinger, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05843339.2 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/47] | WO2005US41261 | Priority number, date | US20040627820P | 15.11.2004 Original published format: US 627820 P | US20050069586 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: US 69586 | US20050129853 | 16.05.2005 Original published format: US 129853 | US20050727569P | 17.10.2005 Original published format: US 727569 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055518 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855770 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/24, // G07F17/32 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
A63F13/80 (KR);
A63F9/24 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3288 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | A63F9/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLÜCKSSPIEL ZU LEHRZWECKEN | [2007/47] | English: | EDUCATIONAL GAMES OF CHANCE | [2007/47] | French: | JEUX DE HASARD A CARACTERE EDUCATIF | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 22.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2004210507 (ASHER JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [YP]US2005116410 (VLAZNY KENNETH A [US], et al); | [A]US6536766 (DEITCH DONALD T [US], et al); | [XP]US2005245308 (AMAITIS LEE M [GB], et al); | [A]US2005245310 (AMAITIS LEE M [GB], et al); | [A]US2006046817 (PAULSEN CRAIG A [US], et al) |