EP1835517 - THIN KEY SHEET AND THIN KEY UNIT INCORPORATING THE THIN KEY SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNARROW LTD. 6-1 Hacchobori 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0032 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENMOCHI, Yoshio, c/o Sunarrow Limited 6-1, Hacchobori 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-0032 / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05844842.4 | 28.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005JP24024 | Priority number, date | JP20040378678 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004378678 | JP20050016253 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005016253 | [2007/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006070854 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835517 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/14, H01H11/00, H01H13/02, H01H13/702, H01H13/88 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H04M1/23 (EP,KR,US);
H01H13/703 (EP,KR,US);
H01H13/88 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2205/016 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2209/0021 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2209/074 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2211/006 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2211/026 (EP,US);
H01H2211/03 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2215/004 (EP,US);
H01H2219/018 (EP,US);
H01H2221/006 (EP,US);
H01H2227/01 (EP,US);
H01H2227/024 (EP,US);
H01H2227/036 (EP,US);
H01H2229/028 (EP,US);
H01H2229/058 (EP,US);
H01H2231/022 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | H01H13/14, H01H11/00, H01H13/02, H01H13/702 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNNES SCHLÜSSELBLATT UND DÜNNE SCHLÜSSELEINHEIT MIT DEM DÜNNEN SCHLÜSSELBLATT | [2007/38] | English: | THIN KEY SHEET AND THIN KEY UNIT INCORPORATING THE THIN KEY SHEET | [2007/38] | French: | CLAVIER SOUPLE MINCE ET UNITE DE TOUCHES MINCE INCORPORANT LEDIT CLAVIER | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | Translation filed | 25.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 21.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1467391 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [00064]; figures 2-4,34-36 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * [Y] 3,4,6,11,13 [I] 2,7-10,12; | [XA]EP0896349 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-3; claim 8 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]EP1164606 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]JP2003131787 (NEC SAITAMA LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-13; | [YA]JP2004193060 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1-5,7-13; | [YDA]US5945463 (KAWABUCHI ICHIRO [JP], et al) [YD] 3,4,11,13 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-10,12; | [A]EP1035557 (SEIKO PRECISION KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2222485 (KOKOKU RUBBER TECH [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH11329149 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2004079339 (SEIKO PRECISION KK); | [A]JP2004193060 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO) |