EP1814630 - APPLICATIONS OF THE STIMULATION OF NEURAL TISSUE USING LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECHARMS, Christopher 1461 Hill Street Montara, CA 94037-0786 / US | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Clarke, Alison Clare HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05848576.4 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US41431 | Priority number, date | US20040628258P | 15.11.2004 Original published format: US 628258 P | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055582 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814630 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61N5/0622 (EP,US);
A61N5/0601 (EP,US);
A61N2005/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN ZUR NERVENGEWEBESTIMULIERUNG MITTELS LICHT | [2007/32] | English: | APPLICATIONS OF THE STIMULATION OF NEURAL TISSUE USING LIGHT | [2007/32] | French: | APPLICATIONS UTILISANT DE LA LUMIERE POUR STIMULER UN TISSU NERVEUX | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03020103 (AMIT TECHNOLOGY SCIENCE & MEDI [IL], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 16 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 2 * * page 8, line 9 - line 17 * * page 9, line 16 - line 21 * * page 11, line 8 - line 13 * * page 12, line 4 - line 13 * * page 12, line 25 - line 28 *; | [X]EP0377547 (SPECTEC S A [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 7, line 13 - line 14 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 3 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US6048359 (BIEL MERRILL A [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 17 * * column 1, line 34 - line 37 * * column 3, line 6 - line 15 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 6 * * figure 2 *; | [DA]US2003208245 (MAHADEVAN-JANSEN ANITA [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0045] * | [X] - ALLÈGRE, G. ET AL, "Stimulation in the rat of a nerve fiber bundle by a short UV pulse from an excimer laser", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1994), vol. 180, no. 2, pages 261 - 264, XP002472454 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 262, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(94)90534-7 | International search | [X]US5445608 (CHEN JAMES C [US], et al) | by applicant | WO03020103 | EP0377547 | US6048359 |