EP1943841 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ENCODING DATA FOR VIDEO COMPOSITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YooStar Entertainment Group, Inc. 244 West 54th Street New York, NV 10019 / US | [2009/43] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Megamedia, LLC 6 East 43rd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAKER, Allan, Robert 212 Euclid Avenue, Apt. 310 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | 02 /
STAKER, Heather, Clayton 12 Peabody Terrace, Nr 2B Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
STAKER, Allan, Robert 212 Euclid Avenue, Apt. 310 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | ||
02 /
STAKER, Heather, Clayton 212 Euclid Ave., Apt. 310 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05848786.9 | 03.11.2005 | [2008/29] | WO2005US39817 | Priority number, date | US20040630831P | 04.11.2004 Original published format: US 630831 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006052666 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1943841 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/79, H04N5/91 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/9201 (EP,US);
H04N9/75 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG VON DATEN FUER VIDEO-KOMPOSITION | [2008/29] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ENCODING DATA FOR VIDEO COMPOSITING | [2008/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE DE DONNEES POUR COMPOSITION VIDEO | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 05.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/02] | Public notification(s) | NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS PURSUANT TO RULE 69 (1) EPC, EPO FORM 1205A, SENT ON 05/09/07 . | YooStar Entertainment Group, Inc. 244 West 54th Street New York, NV 10019 / US | [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5751337 (ALLEN DAVID LEE [US], et al); | [Y]US6285408 (CHOI SEUNG-JONG [KR], et al) |