EP1825409 - INFRASTRUCTURE FOR PERFORMING FILE OPERATIONS BY A DATABASE SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORACLE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 500 Oracle Parkway M/S 5op7 Redwood Shores CA 94065 / US | [2019/08] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway M/S 5op7 Redwood Shores CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Namit 2234 Gianera Street Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
AGARWAL, Nipun 4768 Cheeney Street Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 03 /
SEDLAR, Eric 4270 Cesar Chavez Street San Francisco, California 94131 / US | 04 /
IDICULA, Sam 550 Kiely Boulevard, Apt. 38 San Jose, California 95117 / US | 05 /
PANNALA, Syam 4211 Indigo Oak Court San Jose, CA 95121 / US | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
JAIN, Namit 2234 Gianera Street Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
02 /
AGARWAL, Nipun 4768 Cheeney Street Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
03 /
SEDLAR, Eric 4270 Cesar Chavez Street San Francisco, California 94131 / US | |||
04 /
IDICULA, Sam 550 Kiely Boulevard, Apt. 38 San Jose, California 95117 / US | |||
05 /
PANNALA, Syam 405 Rancho Arroyo Parkway, 281 Fremont, California 94536 / US | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2019/08] |
Former [2007/35] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05848788.5 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005US44134 | Priority number, date | US20040014354 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 14354 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006065587 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1825409 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1825409 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/1774 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99938 (US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2019/08] |
Former [2008/13] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFRASTRUKTUR ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON DATEIOPERATIONEN MITTELS EINES DATENBANKSERVERS | [2007/35] | English: | INFRASTRUCTURE FOR PERFORMING FILE OPERATIONS BY A DATABASE SERVER | [2007/35] | French: | INFRASTRUCTURE POUR L'EXECUTION D'OPERATIONS DE FICHIER PAR UN SERVEUR DE BASE DE DONNEES | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2017 | 17.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.02.2019 | [2019/40] | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003033328 (CHA SANG K [KR], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0048]; figures 1-5 *; | [A] - HONGJUN LU ET AL, "T-tree or B-tree: main memory database index structure revisited", DATABASE CONFERENCE, 2000. ADC 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH AUSTRALASIAN CANBERRA, ACT, AUSTRALIA 31 JAN.-3 FEB. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000131), ISBN 0-7695-0528-7, pages 65 - 73, XP010370177 [A] 1-30 * abstract * * Section 2.3 * | [A] - PULLIN D J, "B-TREE INDEX METHODS IN A BINARY RELATIONAL DATABASE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (198312), vol. 26, no. 7A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 3423 - 3426, XP000714328 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0794479 | US2003033328 | - Glenn Colaco ET AL, "Database Performance with NAS: Optimizing Oracle on NFS", Sun Microsystems Technical Whitepaper, (20040501), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.127.7832&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20171020), XP055417562 | by applicant | US2003033328 |