EP1836561 - TRANSLATION LOOKASIDE BUFFER (TLB) SUPPRESSION FOR INTRA-PAGE PROGRAM COUNTER RELATIVE OR ABSOLUTE ADDRESS BRANCH INSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEFFENDERFER, James Norris 4000 Inkberry Court Apex, North Carolina 27539 / US | 02 /
SARTORIUS, Thomas Andrew 1600 Olde Chimney Court Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Rodney Wayne 1400 Bascomb Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | 04 /
STEMPEL, Brian Michael 1309 Wellwater Court Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05849255.4 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005US41998 | Priority number, date | US20040003772 | 02.12.2004 Original published format: US 3772 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006060198 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836561 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/32, G06F1/32, G06F12/10 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
G06F12/1027 (EP,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F1/32 (KR);
G06F9/32 (EP,US);
G06F9/3804 (EP,US);
G06F9/382 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERDRÜCKUNG DES ÜBERSETZUNGS-LOOKASIDE-PUFFERS (TLB) FÜR BEFEHLSZÄHLER-RELATIVE ODER ABSOLUTE ADRESSVERZWEIGUNGSBEFEHLE INNERHALB EINER SEITE | [2007/39] | English: | TRANSLATION LOOKASIDE BUFFER (TLB) SUPPRESSION FOR INTRA-PAGE PROGRAM COUNTER RELATIVE OR ABSOLUTE ADDRESS BRANCH INSTRUCTIONS | [2007/39] | French: | SUPPRESSION DU REPERTOIRE DES PAGES ACTIVES POUR LES INSTRUCTIONS DE BRANCHEMENT INTRA-PAGE A ADRESSES ABSOLUES OU RELATIVES SUR COMPTEUR P | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3800291 (COCKE J, et al); | [A]EP1304620 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al); | [A]US6591343 (COL GERARD M [US], et al); | [XA]US6735689 (THOMSON THOMAS W S [US], et al) |