EP1960220 - ROLLER BLIND COUPLING FOR A VEHICLE SUNROOF ROLLER BLIND, AND ROLLER BLIND STRIP AND VEHICLE SUNROOF ROLLER BLIND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLASL, Sebastian Waldtruderingerstrasse 56A 81827 München / DE | 02 /
ROCKELMANN, Andreas Dietrichsteinstrasse 3A 81249 München / DE | 03 /
KLOTZ, Steven, Henry 8273 Tamarron Drive Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | 04 /
MCCALL, Anthony 21803 Brittany Eastpointe, Michigan 48021 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
GLASL, Sebastian Schwanseestrasse 65A 81549 München / DE | ||
02 /
ROCKELMANN, Andreas Dietrichsteinstrasse 3A 81249 München / DE | |||
03 /
KLOTZ, Steven, Henry 8273 Tamarron Drive Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | |||
04 /
MCCALL, Anthony 21803 Brittany Eastpointe, Michigan 48021 / US | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05849296.8 | 12.12.2005 | [2008/35] | WO2005DE02243 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068217 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960220 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960220 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B60J7/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLOKUPPLUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUGSONNENDACHROLLO, SOWIE ROLLOBAND, SOWIE FAHRZEUGSONNENDACHROLLO | [2008/35] | English: | ROLLER BLIND COUPLING FOR A VEHICLE SUNROOF ROLLER BLIND, AND ROLLER BLIND STRIP AND VEHICLE SUNROOF ROLLER BLIND | [2008/35] | French: | COUPLEUR DE STORE POUR UN STORE DE TOIT OUVRANT DE VÉHICULE, ET BANDE DE STORE, ET STORE DE TOIT OUVRANT DE VÉHICULE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IE | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | LT | 20.01.2010 | LV | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | IS | 20.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 01.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001055046 ; | [A]DE19739919 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 25 - line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002135198 (DE CEUSTER PETER [BE]) [A] 1,14 * figures 6,7 *; | [E]DE102005024657 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [E] 1,14* paragraph [0057]; figure 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001055046 A 20010227 (OI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract * |