EP1828542 - DUAL PRESSURE EULER STEAM TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energent Corporation 2321 South Pullman Street Santa Clara CA 97205 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYS, Lance, G. 345 West First Street, No. 46 Tusti, CA 92780 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05849452.7 | 18.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US41897 | Priority number, date | US20040013073 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 13073 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006065445 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828542 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828542 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/04, F01D1/06 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
F01D1/06 (EP,US);
F01D11/00 (EP,US);
F01D5/041 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2250/315 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | F01D5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | EULERSCHE DOPPELDRUCK-DAMPFTURBINE | [2007/36] | English: | DUAL PRESSURE EULER STEAM TURBINE | [2007/36] | French: | TURBINE A VAPEUR D'EULER A PRESSION DOUBLE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2005 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | IE | 18.11.2014 | LU | 18.11.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.11.2014 | ||
LU | 18.11.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.11.2014 | ||
LU | 18.11.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.11.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.11.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.11.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1359227 (BROLINSON BENGT G) [X] 1,7 * page 1, line 42 - line 66 * [I] 8-11; | [X]DE3300864 (KÜHNLE, KOPP & KAUSCH) [X] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 29 - line 35 * | International search | [X]US3314647 (PAVLECKA VLADIMIR H); | [Y]US3083448 (CHARLES MOORE DONALD, et al); | [Y]US4205942 (YOKOYAMA TOSHIAKI [JP]); | [Y]US3966351 (SPROULE ROBERT STANLEY); | [Y]US4687946 (JONES DONALD J [US]); | [Y]US1860817 (ARVID PETERSON); | [Y]US3083318 (HANSCOM FRANK E); | [Y]US4958986 (BOUSSUGES PIERRE [FR]) |