Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008220685 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 | WO2005IB54391 | 23.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008527436 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 | WO2005IB54391 | 23.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1839085 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05849946 | 23.12.2005 | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 | WO2005IB54391 | 23.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006072862 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101099110 | 02.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200639553 | 16.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP05100067 | 07.01.2005 |