EP1839085 - INTERLEAVED ELECTRODES IN A PASSIVE MATRIX DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Mark, T. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HASKAL, Eliav, I. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KNAPP, Alan, G. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05849946.8 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005IB54391 | Priority number, date | EP20050100067 | 07.01.2005 Original published format: EP 05100067 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072862 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839085 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167, G02F1/1343 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G02F1/134363 (EP,US);
G02F1/133345 (EP,US);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F2201/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHACHTELTE ELEKTRODEN EINER PASSIVMATRIXANZEIGE | [2007/40] | English: | INTERLEAVED ELECTRODES IN A PASSIVE MATRIX DISPLAY | [2007/40] | French: | ELECTRODES ENTRELACEES DANS UN ECRAN A MATRICE PASSIVE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2002167191 ; | [DA]JP2002311461 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002167191 A 20020611 (NIPPON PETROCHEM CO LTD) [DA] 1,12 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002311461 A 20021023 (SHARP CORP) [DA] 1,12 * abstract * |